This case was last updated from PACER on 06/30/2020 at 09:05:30 (UTC).

King v. Medical Data Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 King filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Medical Data Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00617

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cloricia King

Defendant

Medical Data Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J Landreau

Attorney at CREDIT REPAIR LAWYERS OF AMERICA

4 Milton Court

Columbus, GA 31904

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems Inc delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cloricia King. filed by Cloricia King (Landreau, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Medical Data Systems Inc, filed by Cloricia King.(MRR, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems Inc delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cloricia King. filed by Cloricia King (Landreau, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3584026 (B4601105734). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Medical Data Systems Inc, filed by Cloricia King.(MRR, ). (Landreau, Matthew) Modified on 5/5/2020 (MRR, ). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Medical Data Systems Inc, filed by Cloricia King.(MRR, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less