This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 11:24:40 (UTC).

King v. Henry et al

Case Summary

On July 06, 2022, Michell King (“Plaintiff” or “King”), represented by Raymond Lampert, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Mark Henry, Seth Thompson, Brandi Stanifer, and Chance Dry (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking compensatory and declaratory relief for alleged discrimination against Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri with Judge Raymond Lampert presiding.

Plaintiff filed this suit against Defendants under cause of action pursuant to 42 USC §1983.

The complaint stated that “the events giving rise to this cause of action occurred in Douglas County, Missouri, which is within the Western District of Missouri. At all times relevant to this cause of action, the Defendants were members of the Board of Education of the Ava, Missouri R-1 School District. As of the 2021-2022 school year, Plaintiff was a tenured teacher with the Ava School District.”

The complaint further stated that “Plaintiff primarily taught math at Ava Middle School. While working as a math teacher, the scores for Plaintiff’s students were among the highest in the state. As of the 2021-2022 school year, Plaintiff had been the president of the Ava chapter of the Missouri National Education Association (MNEA) for 7 years. In her role as NEA President, Plaintiff spoke on behalf of fellow teachers to the Board of Education.”

Plaintiff alleged that “in 2020 the Ava School District received a Federal monetary grant. Plaintiff, on behalf of her fellow teachers, recommended that the Board of Education use the money to pay a $3,000 per teacher incentive to new hires and existing teachers for the 2021-2022 school year. The Board of Education initially agreed to the above incentive bonus in a unanimous vote.” 

Plaintiff further alleged that “in April 2021, following a new election for the Board of Education, the above members of the Board voted to retract the incentive bonus for the 2021-2022 school year. Following the decision of the Board of Education, Plaintiff expressed her opinion to the Board of Education that doing so would be detrimental to the morale and well-being of the teachers. In March 2022 the above members of the Board of Education voted to remove Plaintiff from her classroom teaching assignment.” 

Plaintiff also alleged that “rather than her previous assignments teaching math, Plaintiff was placed to supervise in-school suspension, which is not a teaching assignment and does not require teaching credentials. Prior to the above action, the Board of Education did not make decisions regarding teacher placement and assignment. Prior to this action, decisions regarding teacher placement and assignment were made by the Superintendent of Schools or individual building Principals.” 

Plaintiff additionally alleged that “Plaintiff’s building principal was not consulted prior to the above action, and was not informed of the intention to remove Plaintiff from her classroom Assignment. The Defendants made the aforesaid decision in order to retaliate against Plaintiff for exercising her rights under the First Amendment of the United State Constitution, including: Freedom of speech, Freedom to petition the government, Freedom of association, Freedom of assembly.”

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested declaratory relief, punitive damages, back pay, lost past and future wages, attorney fees, and litigation costs.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-03169

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jill A. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michell King

Defendants

Mark Henry

Seth Thompson

Brandi Stanifer

Charles Dry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Lampert

2847 S. Ingram Mill Rd., Ste. A-100

Springfield, MO 65804

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Michell King. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Lampert, Raymond) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Michell King. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Lampert, Raymond) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 7/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Raymond Lampert on behalf of Michell King. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8004967. Service due by 10/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lampert, Raymond) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond Lampert