This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:09:31 (UTC).

King v. Davis et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 King filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim, Susan Illston and PSLC CET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08201

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

PSLC CET

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leonard King

San Quentin, CA 94974

Defendants

A. Maxfield

Ron Davis

A.W.R. Bloomfield

Lt. V. Larkins

M. Voong

Lt. R. Sheldton

Sgt. Y. Franco

Cpt. C. Young

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2019) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/2/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

4 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) Prisoner's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leonard King. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 (no process) against Defendants A.W.R. Bloomfield, Ron Davis, Y. Franco, V. Larkins, A. Maxfield, R. Sheldton, M. Voong, C. Young, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 12/17/2019). Filed by Leonard King. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Leonard King. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/2/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2019) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Leonard King. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Prisoner's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leonard King. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 (no process) against Defendants A.W.R. Bloomfield, Ron Davis, Y. Franco, V. Larkins, A. Maxfield, R. Sheldton, M. Voong, C. Young, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 12/17/2019). Filed by Leonard King. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.