This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2022 at 08:30:05 (UTC).

King v. Canaccord Genuity et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 King filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Canaccord Genuity. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-24108

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul King

Miami, FL 33130

Defendants

Canaccord Genuity

Haywood Securites

Graham Saunders

Spiro Kletas

Darren Carrigan

Dimitry Romantsov

Roman Temkin

Sophia King

Michael King

Disanto Law Firm

Ringgenburg Law Firm

Dumoulin Black

Dorsey & Whitney

Big Hugs Holdings

Cannafornia Holdings CA

Cannafornia Holdings

Haywood Securities

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Gerald Edward Greenberg

Attorney at Gelber Schachter & Greenberg PA

One Southeast Third Avenue, Suite 2600

Miami, FL 33131-1715

Andrew Thomas Figueroa

Attorney at Gelber Schachter , Greenberg, P.A.

One Southeast Third Avenue, Suite 2600

Miami, FL 33131

Anthony S. Fiotto

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

200 Clarendon Street, Floor 20

Boston, MA 02116

Eric D. Lawson

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

250 West 55Th Street,

New York, NY 10019

Steven Wayne Davis

Attorney at Haber Law

251 Nw 23 Street

Miami, FL 33127

Michael Arthur Regan Mullavey, Jr

Attorney at Murphy , Anderson, P.A.

1501 San Marco Blvd.

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Xavier A. Franco

Attorney at McArdle Perez & Franco P.L.

255 Alhambra Circle, Ste 925

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Jeffrey Bruce Shalek

Attorney at Phillips Cantor & Shalek, PA

4000 Hollywood Boulevard, Suite 500-North

Hollywood, FL 33021-6755

Robin Corwin Campbell

Attorney at Kaplan Zeena LLP

2 South Biscayne Blvd.

James Miller Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Zeena LLP

2 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3050

Miami, FL 33131

Jeremy Samuel Baum

Attorney at Kaplan Zeena

2 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3050

Miami, FL 33131

Mark David Hunter

Attorney at Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 650

Miami, FL 33134

Jenny Daphne Johnson-Sardella

Attorney at Hunter Taubman Fischer LLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 650

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Melanie Emmons Damian

Attorney at Damian & Valori LLP

1000 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1020

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

57 #4

Exhibit D - Order of Dismissal

57 #3

Exhibit C - Amended Complaint

57 #2

Exhibit B - Order of Dismissal

57 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

57 #57

Main Document

47 #3

Exhibit C

47 #2

Exhibit B

47 #47

Main Document

44 #1

Text of Proposed Order

44 #44

Main Document

#10

(#10) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#9

(#9) Order Providing Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#8

(#8) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#6) Summons Issued as to Big Hugs Holdings, Canaccord Genuity, Cannafornia Holdings, Cannafornia Holdings CA, Darren Carrigan, Disanto Law Firm, Dorsey & Whitney, Dumoulin Black, Haywood Securites, Michael King, Sophia King, Spiro Kletas, Ringgenburg Law Firm, Dimitry Romantsov, Graham Saunders, Roman Temkin. (See DE #5 for image) (pcs) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/23/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS100240775 (asz) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER granting (ECF Nos. #44 , #47 ) Motions to Dismiss. As the Court grants the motions to dismiss under the doctrine of res judicata, this action is dismissed with prejudice, without leave to amend, against all Defendants. Moreover, the Court denies the moving Defendants' motion for sanctions. (ECF No. #57 ). The Clerk is directed to close this case. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 2/3/2022) by Michael King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shalek, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MOTION for Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Canaccord Genuity, Graham Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Order of Dismissal)(Greenberg, Gerald) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE by Haywood Securities re #44 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Damian, Melanie) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Paul King to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Pablopicassojustice@gmail.com (pcs) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Notice of Related Cases / Supplement to Civil Cover by Paul King (pcs) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the moving Defendants' motion for extension of time. #51 . The moving Defendants must respond to the complaint on or before January 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ntd) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Xavier A. Franco (Franco, Xavier) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Cannafornia Holdings, Darren Carrigan, Spiro Kletas. Attorney Steven Wayne Davis added to party Cannafornia Holdings(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Wayne Davis added to party Darren Carrigan(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Wayne Davis added to party Spiro Kletas(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Davis, Steven) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the moving Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time. #48 . The moving Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before January 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ntd) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Providing Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERKS NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Federico A. Moreno elected not to be assigned pro se cases upon taking senior status. Judge Moreno no longer assigned to case. (yar) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Big Hugs Holdings, Canaccord Genuity, Cannafornia Holdings, Cannafornia Holdings CA, Darren Carrigan, Disanto Law Firm, Dorsey & Whitney, Dumoulin Black, Haywood Securites, Michael King, Sophia King, Spiro Kletas, Ringgenburg Law Firm, Dimitry Romantsov, Graham Saunders, Roman Temkin. (See DE #5 for image) (pcs) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Haywood Securites. (pcs) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned judge elected not to be assigned pro se cases upon taking senior status. Accordingly, it is adjudged that the undersigned judge is recused and the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/23/2021. (lfk) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/23/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS100240775 (asz) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Big Hugs Holdings, Canaccord Genuity, Cannafornia Holdings, Cannafornia Holdings CA, Darren Carrigan, Disanto Law Firm, Dorsey & Whitney, Dumoulin Black, Haywood Securites, Michael King, Sophia King, Spiro Kletas, Ringgenburg Law Firm, Dimitry Romantsov, Graham Saunders, Roman Temkin. Filing fees $ 402.00 Not Paid, No IFP Motion Filed, filed by Paul King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ebz) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANNAFORNIA HOLDINGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony S. Fiotto, Jr.