This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2021 at 15:06:49 (UTC).

King v. Allergan, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 King filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patricia Jo King

McMindes

Defendants

Allergan, Inc.

INAMED Corporation

Allergan PLC

Allergan USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James A. Montee

Attorney at MONTEE LAW FIRM

1025 North 22Nd Street, P.O. Box 127

St. Joseph, MO 64502-0127

Amanda Blackwood

Attorney at MONTEE LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 127, 1025 North 22Nd Street

St. Joseph, MO 64502

 

Court Documents

6 #1

MDL-Transfer Letter

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-New Jersey, Docket No. 2921. (Attachments: #1 MDL-Transfer Letter) (MKR) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Allergan, Inc. on 4/14/2021. (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to defendants Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., and Allergan, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested as to Allergan, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4377164), by Attorney James A. Montee on behalf of Patricia King (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to District of of New Jersey. Original electronic file sent. (MKR) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-New Jersey, Docket No. 2921. (Attachments: #1 MDL-Transfer Letter) (MKR) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Allergan, Inc. on 4/14/2021. (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendants Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., and Allergan, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to Allergan, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4377164), by Attorney James A. Montee on behalf of Patricia King (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montee, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INAMED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Allergan PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Blackwood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Albert Montee