This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:00:54 (UTC).

KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC. et al v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against ABBOTT LABORATORIES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03565

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELLCO DRUG CO.

FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.

AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP.

DAKOTA DRUG INC.

H.D. SMITH, LLC.

BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC.

THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C

MCKESSON CORPORATION

THE NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.

VALUE DRUG COMPANY

Defendants

ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC.

ABBVIE INC.

UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.

BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC.

PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID F. SORENSEN

ELLEN T. NOTEWARE

NICHOLAS URBAN

JOHN PAUL BJORK

DAVID P. GERMAINE

JOSEPH M. VANEK

Defendant Attorneys

KIMBERLY A. LAMAINA

ROHIT K SINGLA

PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE

JENNIFER PIKE

JOHN S. YI

JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL

KYLE W. MACH

BENJAMIN M. GREENBLUM

CONSTANCE T. FORKNER

HEIDI K. HUBBARD

BRIAN HAGERTY

SAMUEL BRYANT DAVIDOFF

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#61

#60

#58

#57

#59

#56

#55

46 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#46

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#61) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC..(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#60) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 30 DAYS OF THE COURT RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/27/2019.9/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#58) NOTICE by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) [NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION] (SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#57) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#59) ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR PLFFS TO FILE OPPOSITIONS TO DEFTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 10/21/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/26/19. 9/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#56) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Ltd. with Certificate of Service by ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(LAMAINA, KIMBERLY) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#55) NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY A. LAMAINA on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO, U.S. INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(LAMAINA, KIMBERLY) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#54) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABBVIE INC., ABBVIE PRODUCTS LLC., BESINS HEALTHCARE, INC., UNIMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#46) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(URBAN, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#53) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF HEIDI K. HUBBARD, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/25/19.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/26/19) (kw, ) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including J M Smith Corp. with Certificate of Service by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by J M SMITH CORPORATION.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Corp. and Liberty Acquisition Corp. with Certificate of Service by BELLCO DRUG CO..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Services Corp. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lyndale Enterprises, Inc. with Certificate of Service by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13718363.), filed by KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less