This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2021 at 10:36:09 (UTC).

Kinard v. The City of Pawtucket et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Kinard filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of Pawtucket. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00122

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Kinard

Providence, RI 02904

Defendants

Gianna Petrone

The City of Pawtucket

The Miriam Hospital

Fiona Craft

Dylan Salvatore

Ty Karalis

Noel Pichardo

Office Young

Officer Young

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

John D Plummer

Attorney at Roberts, Carroll, Feldstein & Peirce, Inc.

10 Weybosset Street, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Marc DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street, 272-4442, Fax: 272-9937

Providence, RI 02903

Patrick K. Burns

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

3 #1

Envelope

#3

#2

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Ty Karalis, Officer Young, Noel Pichardo, Dylan Salvatore, The City of Pawtucket.(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Gianna Petrone, DO ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint by Gianna Petrone.(Plummer, John) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Fiona Craft, NP ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint by Fiona Craft.(Plummer, John) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) The Miriam Hospital ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint by The Miriam Hospital.(Plummer, John) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Kinard as to all defendants. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick K. Burns on behalf of Ty Karalis, Officer Young, Noel Pichardo, Dylan Salvatore, The City of Pawtucket (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of Ty Karalis, Officer Young, Noel Pichardo, Dylan Salvatore, The City of Pawtucket (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon Kinard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Fiona Craft, Ty Karalis, Officer Young, Gianna Petrone, Noel Pichardo, Dylan Salvatore, The City of Pawtucket, The Miriam Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number 14670024929 (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Brandon Kinard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Brandon Kinard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc DeSisto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick K Burns