This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2019 at 05:22:51 (UTC).

Kimsaprincess, Inc. et al v. Missguided USA Finance Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Kimsaprincess, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Missguided USA Finance Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01258

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kimsaprincess, Inc.

Kim Kardashian West

Defendants

Missguided Limited

Missguided USA Finance Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Philip Korn

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump and Aldisert LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Michael J Kump

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump and Aldisert LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

#1

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Missguided Limited, Missguided USA Finance Inc. (esa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc. identifying Kimsaprincess, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Missguided Limited, Missguided USA Finance Inc. (esa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Clerk to Enter Default,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, #21 filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Kump, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Request for Entry of Default and GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. No. 17, 19.) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court DENIES Kardashian's request for entry of default against Misguided UK. The Court GRANTS IN PART Kardashian's Motion for Default Judgment against Misguided USA and permanently enjoins Misguided USA from using Kardashian's trademarks in connection with the sale, marketing or distribution of its products. The Court awards Kardashian $2,700,000 in damages and $59,600 in attorneys' fees. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

19 #3

Proposed Order (Proposed Judgment) RE Motion for Default and Entry of Judgment

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Missguided Limited and Missguided USA (Finance), Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Kardashian West, Todd Wilson, and Gregory Korn Filed in Support of Motion For Entry of Default and Default Judgment, #2 Proposed Order RE Motion for Default and Entry of Judgment against Defendant Missguided Limited, #3 Proposed Order (Proposed Judgment) RE Motion for Default and Entry of Judgment) (Kump, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#22

(#22) DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Misguided USA in the amount of $2,700,000.00 in damages and $59,600.00 in attorneys' fees. Furthermore, Misguided USA is hereby permanently enjoined from using Plaintiffs' trademarks in connection with the sale, marketing or distribution of its products. Related to: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Missguided Limited and Missguided USA (Finance), Inc. #19 (bm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

19 #2

Proposed Order RE Motion for Default and Entry of Judgment against Defendant Mis

19 #1

Declaration of Kim Kardashian West, Todd Wilson, and Gregory Korn Filed in Suppo

#17

(#17) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Missguided Limited filed by Plaintiffs Kimsaprincess, Inc., Kim Kardashian West. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Missguided Limited #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. The Clerk does not have the authority to enter default against a foreign entity. (bm) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE: COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Entry of Default Against Defendant Missguided Limited #23 , set for 8/19/2019, is hereby TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance by counsel will be necessary. This matter is appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. by Judge Virginia A. Phillips THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Clerk to Enter Default,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, #21 filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Kump, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Misguided USA in the amount of $2,700,000.00 in damages and $59,600.00 in attorneys' fees. Furthermore, Misguided USA is hereby permanently enjoined from using Plaintiffs' trademarks in connection with the sale, marketing or distribution of its products. Related to: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Missguided Limited and Missguided USA (Finance), Inc. #19 (bm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Request for Entry of Default and GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. No. 17, 19.) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court DENIES Kardashian's request for entry of default against Misguided UK. The Court GRANTS IN PART Kardashian's Motion for Default Judgment against Misguided USA and permanently enjoins Misguided USA from using Kardashian's trademarks in connection with the sale, marketing or distribution of its products. The Court awards Kardashian $2,700,000 in damages and $59,600 in attorneys' fees. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE: COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment #19 , set for 6/10/2019, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. This matter is appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. No appearance by counsel will be necessary by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Missguided Limited and Missguided USA (Finance), Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Kardashian West, Todd Wilson, and Gregory Korn Filed in Support of Motion For Entry of Default and Default Judgment, #2 Proposed Order RE Motion for Default and Entry of Judgment against Defendant Missguided Limited, #3 Proposed Order (Proposed Judgment) RE Motion for Default and Entry of Judgment) (Kump, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Missguided Limited #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. The Clerk does not have the authority to enter default against a foreign entity. (bm) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Missguided Limited filed by Plaintiffs Kimsaprincess, Inc., Kim Kardashian West. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Missguided Limited #15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The name of the person served does not exactly match the person named in complaint. (yl) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Missguided Limited filed by Plaintiffs Kimsaprincess, Inc., Kim Kardashian West. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimsaprincess, Inc., Kim Kardashian West, upon Defendant Missguided USA Finance Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tara Fox, Agent for Service for Missguided USA (Finance) Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kump, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Missguided Limited, Missguided USA Finance Inc. (esa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc. identifying Kimsaprincess, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kim Kardashian West, Kimsaprincess, Inc.. (Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23243360 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Kimsaprincess, Inc., Kim Kardashian West. (Attorney Gregory Philip Korn added to party Kim Kardashian West(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Philip Korn added to party Kimsaprincess, Inc.(pty:pla))(Korn, Gregory) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.