This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 08:38:03 (UTC).

KIMBROUGH v. SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 KIMBROUGH filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah Evans Barker and Debra McVicker Lynch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01217

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOEY KIMBROUGH

Kokomo, IN 46902

Defendants

SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Schultz

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Joseph D. Kern

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP (Chicago)

151 N. Franklin, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Bo Alexander Stewart

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant Street, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Logan C. Hughes

Attorney at REMINGER CO. LPA (Indianapolis)

8909 Purdue Road, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46268

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ORDER - Plaintiff Joey Kimbrough, who is proceeding pro se, has filed a motion to remove incorrectly filed documents (Dkt. 28). The document Mr. Kimbrough asks to remove is his motion to strike defendant Snap-On Credit LLC's answer. The motion to remove makes clear that plaintiff no longer seeks to strike defendant's answer and requests that the court "remove the incorrectly filed documents permanently from the Court's public docket." Being duly advised, the court orders as follows. The motion at Dkt. #28 is granted in part and denied in part. The court will not "remove" the plaintiff's motion to strike (Dkt. #26 ), but will deny it as moot. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/11/2022. (SWM) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#25

(#25) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - COME NOW Plaintiff Joey Kimbrough ("Kimbrough") and Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, Inc. ("Equifax"), by Kimbrough, Pro Se, and Equifax through respective counsel of record, and filed a Stipulation of Dismissal of this cause of action as to EQUIFAX ONLY, with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. And the Court, having considered said Stipulation and being fully advised in the premises, now finds the Stipulation of Dismissal should be and hereby is, APPROVED is now DISMISSED as to Equifax Information Solutions, Inc. ONLY, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/27/2022. (CKM) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC.(Kern, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Bo Alexander Stewart for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/22/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Kimbrough via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC. (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOEY KIMBROUGH. (CKM) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#4

(#7) NOTICE of Service, filed by Plaintiff JOEY KIMBROUGH, re #4 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for EXPERIAN, #2 Affidavit of Service for EQUIFAX, #3 Affidavit of Service for SNAP INC.) (CKM) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER - Plaintiff Joey Kimbrough, who is proceeding pro se, has filed a motion to remove incorrectly filed documents (Dkt. 28). The document Mr. Kimbrough asks to remove is his motion to strike defendant Snap-On Credit LLC's answer. The motion to remove makes clear that plaintiff no longer seeks to strike defendant's answer and requests that the court "remove the incorrectly filed documents permanently from the Court's public docket." Being duly advised, the court orders as follows. The motion at Dkt. #28 is granted in part and denied in part. The court will not "remove" the plaintiff's motion to strike (Dkt. #26 ), but will deny it as moot. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/11/2022. (SWM) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Administrative MOTION to Remove, filed by Plaintiff JOEY KIMBROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (CKM) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION of Dismissal, as to Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC, filed by JOEY KIMBROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CKM) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Strike #24 SNAP-ON CREDIT Answer to Complaint, filed by Plaintiff JOEY KIMBROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (CKM) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - COME NOW Plaintiff Joey Kimbrough ("Kimbrough") and Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, Inc. ("Equifax"), by Kimbrough, Pro Se, and Equifax through respective counsel of record, and filed a Stipulation of Dismissal of this cause of action as to EQUIFAX ONLY, with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. And the Court, having considered said Stipulation and being fully advised in the premises, now finds the Stipulation of Dismissal should be and hereby is, APPROVED is now DISMISSED as to Equifax Information Solutions, Inc. ONLY, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/27/2022. (CKM) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC.(Kern, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) EQUIFAX SETTLEMENT STIPULATION of DISMISSAL, as to Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, ONLY filed by JOEY KIMBROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Order) (CKM) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Bo Alexander Stewart for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/22/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Kimbrough via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Attorney(s) Bo Alexander Stewart to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7197141), filed by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Bo) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The parties shall attend the conference by calling 888-363-4734, access code 5451691. See Order for additional information. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/19/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re, filed by Defendant SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC. (Kern, Joseph) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Kern on behalf of Defendant SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC. (Kern, Joseph) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC. (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Service, filed by Plaintiff JOEY KIMBROUGH, re #4 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for EXPERIAN, #2 Affidavit of Service for EQUIFAX, #3 Affidavit of Service for SNAP INC.) (CKM) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Compliance Department as to Joey Kimbrough. (Attachments: #1 Letter 2, #2 Exhibit a, #3 Exhibit b, #4 Exhibit c, #5 Exhibit d, #6 Exhibit e, #7 Exhibit f) (CKM) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOEY KIMBROUGH. (CKM) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC, SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC. (CKM) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • Docket(#3) RECEIPT #478 for filing fee in the amount of $402.00, paid by JOEY KIMBROUGH. (JSR) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC, SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC, filed by JOEY KIMBROUGH. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(JSR) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNAP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Logan C. Hughes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph D Kern