This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 09:24:36 (UTC).

Kimbrell v. Best Loving Care at Home, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Kimbrell filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Best Loving Care at Home, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. Scriven and Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02257

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rachel Kimbrell

Defendants

Best Loving Care at Home, LLC

Salvatore Farinella

Tinley Park, IL 60487

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Birk

Attorney at Matthew Birk, Esq., Law Office

309 Ne 1St St.

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew W. Birk on behalf of Rachel Kimbrell. Lead Counsel: Matthew W. Birk. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER titled Response and Correction to the #1 Complaint by Rachel Kimbrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payroll, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clock in)(BD) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Payroll

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - Clock in

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER titled Response and Correction to the #1 Complaint by Rachel Kimbrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payroll, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clock in)(BD) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew W. Birk on behalf of Rachel Kimbrell. Lead Counsel: Matthew W. Birk. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Best Loving Care at Home, LLC, Salvatore Farinella. (TDC) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-2257-MSS-TGW. (NAS) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18744039) filed by Rachel Kimbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) Modified on 9/24/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew William Kumin