This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2020 at 13:51:38 (UTC).

Ira Lee Kimble v. WDW Joint Venture et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Ira Lee Kimble filed an Other lawsuit against WDW Joint Venture. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ira Lee Kimble

Defendants

Morris Weiss & Stanley Diller Partnership

Does 1 through 250, inclusive

WDW Joint Venture

United States of America

Robert Wilkie

Morris Weiss and Stanley Diller Partnership

WDW Joint Venture doing business as Downey Community Health Center

Interested Party and In Re

In Re: State Court Subpoena of and State Court Order to Federal Non-Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Garcia

Attorney at Garcia and Artigliere

One World Trade Center Suite 1950

Long Beach, CA 90831

Interested Party and Defendant Attorney

Daniel Oren Blau

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO QUASH STATE COURT SUBPOENA AND VACATE STATE COURT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the subpoena directed to the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs is quashed, that the order directed to the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs is vacated, and that this action is DISMISSED. (sbou) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Quash Subpoena filed by Real Parties in Interest United States of America, Robert Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Hearing on Motion to Quash State Court Subpoena of and Vacate State Court Order to Federal Non-Party (ECF No. #6 ) by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: Pursuant to General Order No. 05-07, and the Notice to All Parties issued by Judge Klausner (ECF No. 7), the Motion has been referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The Court elects to proceed with the hearing as noticed on February 25, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.; response briefing shall proceed in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document.) (sbou) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#7

(#7) (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Real Parties in Interest United States of America and Robert Wilkie's Motion to Quash State Court Subpoena of and Vacate State Court Order to Federal Non-Party #6 , filed on January 18, 2019, is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Audero. (bp) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

6 #2

Proof of Service

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash State Court Subpoena of and Vacate State Court Order to Federal Non-Party; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Real Party in Interest United States of America, Robert Wilkie. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Interested Party In Re: State Court Subpoena of and State Court Order to Federal Non-Party. (Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3B

1 #3

Exhibit 3A

1 #1

Exhibit 1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO QUASH STATE COURT SUBPOENA AND VACATE STATE COURT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the subpoena directed to the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs is quashed, that the order directed to the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs is vacated, and that this action is DISMISSED. (sbou) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION to Quash Subpoena filed by Real Parties in Interest United States of America, Robert Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Hearing on Motion to Quash State Court Subpoena of and Vacate State Court Order to Federal Non-Party (ECF No. #6 ) by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: Pursuant to General Order No. 05-07, and the Notice to All Parties issued by Judge Klausner (ECF No. 7), the Motion has been referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The Court elects to proceed with the hearing as noticed on February 25, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.; response briefing shall proceed in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document.) (sbou) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Real Parties in Interest United States of America and Robert Wilkie's Motion to Quash State Court Subpoena of and Vacate State Court Order to Federal Non-Party #6 , filed on January 18, 2019, is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Audero. (bp) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash State Court Subpoena of and Vacate State Court Order to Federal Non-Party; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Real Party in Interest United States of America, Robert Wilkie. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 250, inclusive, Morris Weiss and Stanley Diller Partnership, United States of America, WDW Joint Venture, Robert Wilkie., filed by plaintiff Ira Lee Kimble. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/29/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Interested Party In Re: State Court Subpoena of and State Court Order to Federal Non-Party. (Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number VC066607 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Real Parties in Interest In Re: State Court Subpoena of and State Court Order to Federal Non-Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proof of Service) (Attorney Daniel Oren Blau added to party In Re: State Court Subpoena of and State Court Order to Federal Non-Party(pty:ip))(Blau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Morris Weiss & Stanley Diller Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where W D W JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Oren Blau