This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:09:04 (UTC).

Kimberly Ramirez et al v. Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Kimberly Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Fisher Scientific Company L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05898

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christopher Greeley

Kimberly Ramirez

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Cross Claimants

Does 2 to 50, inclusive

Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.

Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant

Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Lawrence Ellis

Attorney at Ellis Law Corporation

2230 East Maple Avenue

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Lisa P Gruen

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

777 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

David S Osterman

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

301 Carnegie Center Boulevard Suite 200

Princeton, NJ 08540-6530

Thomas J O'Grady

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

301 Carnegie Center Drive Suite 200

Princeton, NJ 08540-6587

Michael C Douglass

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Michael C Douglass

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. O'Grady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24319129) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Failed to provide GSC for PA. (lt) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

13 #2

Proposed Order

13 #1

Exhibit

#13

(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. O'Grady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24319129) filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#12

(#12) INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#11

(#11) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney David S. Osterman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC., designating Lisa Gruen as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#9

(#9) MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court sets the following dates: Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

8 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

8 #2

Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing

8 #1

Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David S. Osterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24244693) filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#7

(#7) Fisher Scientific, L.L.C.'s ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #6 and, COUNTERCLAIM against Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C..(Attorney Michael C Douglass added to party Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Douglass, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc..(Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/12/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#4

(#4) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. O'Grady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24319129) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Failed to provide GSC for PA. (lt) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. O'Grady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24319129) filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney David S. Osterman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC., designating Lisa Gruen as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court sets the following dates: Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David S. Osterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24244693) filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Fisher Scientific, L.L.C.'s ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #6 and, COUNTERCLAIM against Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C..(Attorney Michael C Douglass added to party Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Douglass, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc..(Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/12/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Ramirez, Christopher Greeley, upon Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. served on 6/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 2) (esa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C., filed by plaintiffs Kimberly Ramirez, Christopher Greeley. (Filed in state court 9/19/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 6) (esa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Barbara Superior Court, case number 18CV04618 Receipt No: 0973-24054992 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Declaration Certification of Interested Parties, #6 Declaration Consent to Removal, #7 Declaration Proof of Service) (Attorney Lisa P Gruen added to party Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc.(pty:dft))(Gruen, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Douglass