This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2022 at 09:33:29 (UTC).

KIMBALL v. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 KIMBALL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John Michael Vazquez and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04163

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIE KIMBALL

Defendants

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

AUDI OF AMERICA, INC.

AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY S. GRAIFMAN

Attorney at KANTROWITZ, GOLDHAMER & GRAIFMAN, PC

135 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Montvale, NJ 07645

Defendant Attorney

HOMER B. RAMSEY

Attorney at HERZFELD & RUBIN, LLC

354 Eisenhower Parkway

Livingston, NJ 07039

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas P. Sobran, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13629594.) (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to THOMAS P. SOBRAN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/1/2022. (dam) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

15 #3

Text of Proposed Order

15 #2

Declaration Of Thomas P. Sobran

15 #1

Declaration of Gary S. Graifman ISO Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Thomas P. Sobran

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael B. Gallub to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13583184.) (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of MICHAEL B. GALLUB, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/22/2022. (dam) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint, (Exhibits 1-7) by JULIE KIMBALL. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons For Audi Aktiengesellschaft

1 #3

Summons For Audi of America, Inc.

1 #2

Summons For Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft

1 #1

Summons For Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, THOMAS P. SOBRAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas P. Sobran, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13629594.) (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to THOMAS P. SOBRAN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/1/2022. (dam) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Thomas P. Sobran, Esq. Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Thomas P. Sobran, Esq. by JULIE KIMBALL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary S. Graifman ISO Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Thomas P. Sobran, #2 Declaration Of Thomas P. Sobran, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL B. GALLUB, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael B. Gallub to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13583184.) (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of MICHAEL B. GALLUB, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/22/2022. (dam) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter from Homer B. Ramsey to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael B. Gallub. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Michael B. Gallub, #3 Certification of Homer B. Ramsey)(RAMSEY, HOMER) Modified on 7/22/2022 (dam). (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter from Gary S. Graifman To DNJ Clerk re: Withdrawal Of ECF Dk. No. 7 And 10 Erroneously Filed re #7 Summons Returned Executed. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JULIE KIMBALL. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JULIE KIMBALL. AUDI OF AMERICA, INC. served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JULIE KIMBALL. AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.'s Time to Respond to the Class Action Complaint through and including 9/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/19/2022. (dam) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint, (Exhibits 1-7) by JULIE KIMBALL. (GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13498893) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JULIE KIMBALL. (Attachments: #1 Summons For Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., #2 Summons For Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, #3 Summons For Audi of America, Inc., #4 Summons For Audi Aktiengesellschaft, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUDI OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOMER B. RAMSEY