This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2023 at 07:48:54 (UTC).

Jong Uk Kim v. Bank of America, N.A., et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Jong Uk Kim filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bank of America, N A ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02089

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jong Uk Kim

Defendants

MAS Financial Services, Inc.

Freeway Funding, Inc.

The Bank of Missouri

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Bank of America, N.A.

Capital One Bank USA N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Michael Loker

Attorney at Loker Law APC

1303 East Grand Avenue Suite 101

Arroyo Grande, CA 93420

Elizabeth Ann Wagner

Attorney at Loker Law APC

1303 East Grand Avenue Suite 101

Arroyo Grande, CA 93420

Defendant Attorneys

Artin Betpera

Attorney at Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

18400 Von Karman Avenue Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Christopher D Holt

Attorney at Musick Peeler and Garrett

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Jennifer Rebecca Brooks

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam Street Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002-2812

Theodore Roethke

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Michael Akira Kushner

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

Joseph M Crittenden

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111-3821

Hunter R Eley

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Freeway Funding, Inc..(Betpera, Artin) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

23 #1

Proposed Order to Extend Defendant Capital One, N.A.'s Time to Respond to C

#23

(#23) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 2, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Defendant Capital One, N.A.'s Time to Respond to Complaint)(Eley, Hunter) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and Affirmative and Other Defenses filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theodore Roethke on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attorney Theodore Roethke added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Bank of Missouri answer now due 1/19/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(Attorney Christopher D Holt added to party The Bank of Missouri(pty:dft))(Holt, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Freeway Funding, Inc. answer now due 1/13/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Freeway Funding, Inc..(Attorney Artin Betpera added to party Freeway Funding, Inc.(pty:dft))(Betpera, Artin) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

18 #1

Proof of Service

#18

(#18) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Capital One Bank USA N.A. answer now due 1/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Hunter R Eley added to party Capital One Bank USA N.A.(pty:dft))(Eley, Hunter) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

4 #2

Attachment #2 re: Summons

4 #1

Attachment #1 re: Summons

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1 re: Summons, #2 Attachment #2 re: Summons)(Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#3

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1 re: Summons, #2 Attachment #2 re: Summons)(Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#2

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1 re: Summons, #2 Attachment #2 re: Summons)(Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#1

(#16) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bank of America, N.A. answer now due 1/9/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A..(Attorney Joseph M Crittenden added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(Crittenden, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Freeway Funding, Inc..(Betpera, Artin) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 2, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Defendant Capital One, N.A.'s Time to Respond to Complaint)(Eley, Hunter) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and Affirmative and Other Defenses filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theodore Roethke on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attorney Theodore Roethke added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Bank of Missouri answer now due 1/19/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Bank of Missouri.(Attorney Christopher D Holt added to party The Bank of Missouri(pty:dft))(Holt, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Freeway Funding, Inc. answer now due 1/13/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Freeway Funding, Inc..(Attorney Artin Betpera added to party Freeway Funding, Inc.(pty:dft))(Betpera, Artin) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Capital One Bank USA N.A. answer now due 1/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Hunter R Eley added to party Capital One Bank USA N.A.(pty:dft))(Eley, Hunter) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Voluntary Dismissal of Trans Union, LLC without Prejudice)(Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bank of America, N.A. answer now due 1/9/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A..(Attorney Joseph M Crittenden added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(Crittenden, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Brooks on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attorney Jennifer Rebecca Brooks added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Brooks, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for further details) (pj) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Capital One Bank USA N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Freeway Funding, Inc., MAS Financial Services, Inc., The Bank of Missouri, Trans Union, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1 re: Summons, #2 Attachment #2 re: Summons)(Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim, identifying none that Plaintiff is aware of. (Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim. (Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34336408 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jong Uk Kim. (Attorney Elizabeth Ann Wagner added to party Jong Uk Kim(pty:pla))(Wagner, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less