This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2019 at 07:11:31 (UTC).

Kim Thompson v. QVC, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Kim Thompson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against QVC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00908

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim Thompson

Defendants

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

QVC Ontario, LLC

QVC, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica L Campbell

Kashif Haque

Samuel A Wong

Suren N Weerasuriya

Defendant Attorneys

Lara Levine

Timothy L Hix

Monica A Rodriguez

Daniel C Whang

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER VOLUNTARY DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) AND VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLASS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 23(e) #14 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff Kim Thompson's individual claims in this case are dismissed without prejudice under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and Plaintiff's class action claims are dismissed without prejudice under Rules23(e) and 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Declaration

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kim Thompson. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Weerasuriya, Suren) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

13 #3

Proposed Order

13 #2

Appendix

13 #1

Memorandum

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Order) (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Suren N Weerasuriya counsel for Plaintiff Kim Thompson. Adding Suren Weerasuriya as counsel of record for Plaintiff Kim Thompson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kim Thompson. (Attorney Suren N Weerasuriya added to party Kim Thompson(pty:pla))(Weerasuriya, Suren) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1446(D) filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00908 FMO (SHKx). (esa) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc, identifying 1. Kim Thompson, Plaintiff 2. QVC, Inc. 3. QVC Ontario, LLC. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Monica Rodriguez re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1909884 Receipt No: 0973-23743277 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Monica A Rodriguez added to party QVC Ontario, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Monica A Rodriguez added to party QVC, Inc(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER VOLUNTARY DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) AND VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLASS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 23(e) #14 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff Kim Thompson's individual claims in this case are dismissed without prejudice under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and Plaintiff's class action claims are dismissed without prejudice under Rules23(e) and 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kim Thompson. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Weerasuriya, Suren) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Order) (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Suren N Weerasuriya counsel for Plaintiff Kim Thompson. Adding Suren Weerasuriya as counsel of record for Plaintiff Kim Thompson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kim Thompson. (Attorney Suren N Weerasuriya added to party Kim Thompson(pty:pla))(Weerasuriya, Suren) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1446(D) filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00908 FMO (SHKx). (esa) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Filed in state court 5/14/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 99)(esa) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Kim Thompson. (Filed in state court 4/2/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 3) (esa) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc, identifying 1. Kim Thompson, Plaintiff 2. QVC, Inc. 3. QVC Ontario, LLC. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of Monica Rodriguez re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION of Emily Reybitz re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1909884 Receipt No: 0973-23743277 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants QVC Ontario, LLC, QVC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Monica A Rodriguez added to party QVC Ontario, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Monica A Rodriguez added to party QVC, Inc(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less