This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 08:17:42 (UTC).

KILPATRICK v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 KILPATRICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06601

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASSANDRA KILPATRICK

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at MARTIN BAUGHMAN, PLLC

3710 Rawlins Streetsuite 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet for Cassandra Kilpatrick

1 #2

Original Filing Form for Cassandra Kilpatrick

1 #3

Summons for Cook Group Incorporated

1 #4

Summons for Cook Incorporated

1 #5

Summons for Cook Medical Incorporated

1 #6

Summons Cook Medical LLC

1 #7

Summons for William Cook Europe ApS

#2

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/22/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal , as to Defendants COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Plaintiff CASSANDRA KILPATRICK, filed by CASSANDRA KILPATRICK. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06601-RLY-TAB(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal , as to Defendants COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Plaintiff CASSANDRA KILPATRICK, filed by CASSANDRA KILPATRICK. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06601-RLY-TAB(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#8) Remark - Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 8:21-cv-1819 on 9/16/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6600-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Missouri, Cause No. 4:21-cv-1055 on 9/16/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6601-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Jersey, Cause No. 2:21-cv-13028 on 9/16/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6602-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Tennessee, Cause No. 3:21-cv-643 on 9/20/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6603-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06600-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06601-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06602-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06603-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/22/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01055. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of Indiana. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/16/2021.] (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-163) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DLB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/16/2021.] (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/5/2021. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/16/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 5 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Laura J Baughman. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/16/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Cassandra Kilpatrick Process Server: Certified Corporate & Process Services (Baughman, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/16/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8826756, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Cassandra Kilpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Cassandra Kilpatrick, #2 Original Filing Form for Cassandra Kilpatrick, #3 Summons for Cook Group Incorporated, #4 Summons for Cook Incorporated, #5 Summons for Cook Medical Incorporated, #6 Summons Cook Medical LLC, #7 Summons for William Cook Europe ApS)(Baughman, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/16/2021.] (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant