This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2020 at 09:43:40 (UTC).

Killam v. Port of Seattle

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Killam filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Port of Seattle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00432

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adrianna Killam

Defendant

Port of Seattle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Conrad Reynoldson

Michael M Terasaki

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Harms

Justo Gonzalez

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Corrected Notice of Withdrawal

#8

(#8) PRAECIPE re #7 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - Corrected by Plaintiff Adrianna Killam (Attachments: #1 Corrected Notice of Withdrawal)(Terasaki, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Michael M Terasaki for Plaintiff Adrianna Killam. (Terasaki, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER re parties' #5 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Case Until June 5 Pending Settlement Negotiations. Case stayed until 6/5/2020; Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#5

(#5) Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR STAY, filed by Defendant Port of Seattle. Noting Date 5/7/2020, (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justo Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Port of Seattle. (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/30/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Port of Seattle (ST) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Port of Seattle with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6223714), filed by Adrianna Killam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terasaki, Michael) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRAECIPE re #7 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - Corrected by Plaintiff Adrianna Killam (Attachments: #1 Corrected Notice of Withdrawal)(Terasaki, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Michael M Terasaki for Plaintiff Adrianna Killam. (Terasaki, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re parties' #5 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Case Until June 5 Pending Settlement Negotiations. Case stayed until 6/5/2020; Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR STAY, filed by Defendant Port of Seattle. Noting Date 5/7/2020, (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Joshua Harms added as counsel for Port of Seattle per #4 Notice of Appearance. (PM) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justo Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Port of Seattle. (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/30/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Port of Seattle (ST) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (ST) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Port of Seattle with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6223714), filed by Adrianna Killam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terasaki, Michael) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less