This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2020 at 13:21:35 (UTC).

Killam v. Benoliel

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Killam filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Benoliel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is James L. Robart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00502

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adrianna Killam

Defendant

David Benoliel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bonnie Nobuko Fong

Attorney at WASHINGTON CIVIL AND DISABILITY ADVOCATE

4115 Roosevelt Way Ne Ste B

Seattle, WA 98105

Conrad Reynoldson

Attorney at WASHINGTON CIVIL AND DISABILITY ADVOCATE

4115 Roosevelt Way Ne Ste B

Seattle, WA 98105

Bonnie Fong

Attorney at WASHINGTON CIVIL AND DISABILITY ADVOCATE

4115 Roosevelt Way Ne Ste B

Seattle, WA 98105

Defendant Attorney

Charles P Rullman, III

Attorney at CORR DOWNS PLLC

100 W Harrison St Ste N440

Seattle, WA 98119

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/12/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/26/2020. (AD) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David Benoliel.(Rullman, Charles) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles P Rullman, III on behalf of Defendant David Benoliel. (Rullman, Charles) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) David Benoliel (SG) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) David Benoliel with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6249480), filed by Adrianna Killam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fong, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/12/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/26/2020. (AD) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David Benoliel.(Rullman, Charles) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles P Rullman, III on behalf of Defendant David Benoliel. (Rullman, Charles) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) David Benoliel (SG) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketJudge James L. Robart added. (SG) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) David Benoliel with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6249480), filed by Adrianna Killam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fong, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less