This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2021 at 21:34:42 (UTC).

Kihnke v. LM Insurance Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Kihnke filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LM Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John C. Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John C. Coughenour

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEVIN KIHNKE

L&K Coffee dba Magnum Roastery

Defendants

Melanie Bondera agent of d/b/a Kanalani Ohana Farm

Smithfarms LLC

Bruce Corker agent of d/b/a Rancho Aloha

Liberty Insurance Corporation

LM Insurance Corporation

Colehour Bondera agent of d/b/a Kanalani Ohana Farm

Bruce Corker doing business as Rancho Aloha

Melanie Bondera doing business as Kanalani Ohana Farm

Colehour Bondera doing business as Kanalani Ohana Farm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen G Skinner

Attorney at ANDREWS SKINNER

3412 Nw 72Nd St

Seattle, WA 98117

Pamela Marie Andrews

Attorney at ANDREWS SKINNER

645 Elliott Avenue W, Ste 350

Seattle, WA 98119-3911

Dan E Heck

Attorney at HATTON PETRIE & STACKLER APC

12 Journey Ste 255

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Michael G Atkins

Attorney at ATKINS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY PLLC

113 Cherry Street, #18483

Seattle, WA 98104-2205

Gregory M. Hatton

Attorney at HATTON PETRIE & STACKLER APC

12 Journey Ste 255

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C Erickson

Attorney at NICOLL BLACK & FEIG PLLC

1325 Fourth Avenue, Ste 1650

Seattle, WA 98101

Curt H Feig

Attorney at NICOLL BLACK & FEIG PLLC

1325 Fourth Avenue, Ste 1650

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

#7

6 #1

Summons Liberty Insurance Corporation

#6

5 #1

Summons

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Motion terminated: #13 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer Venue filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, per the filing of the #18 Amended Complaint and per the direction of Chambers. (SR) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Stephen G Skinner for Plaintiff Kevin Kihnke. (Skinner, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT (Duplicate of dkt. #18 ) against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kevin Kihnke.(Heck, Dan) Modified on 2/23/2021 to identify as a duplicate filing (PM). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kevin Kihnke.(Heck, Dan) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael G Atkins on behalf of Plaintiff Kevin Kihnke. (Atkins, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Matthew C Erickson added for LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation; per #16 Notice of Appearance. (LH) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Curt H Feig on behalf of Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in W.D. Mich., case number(s) in other court 1:20-cv-00806-JTN-PJG ; filed by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Matt Erickson filed by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Exhibit 9-16, #3 Exhibit 17-24)(Feig, Curt) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendants LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/26/2021, (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gregory M. Hatton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Kevin Kihnke (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6905394 (Skinner, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on LM Insurance Corporation on 1/13/2021, filed by Plaintiff Kevin Kihnke. (Skinner, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Liberty Insurance Corporation on 1/13/2021, filed by Plaintiff Kevin Kihnke. (Skinner, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons Liberty Insurance Corporation) (PM) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Kevin Kihnke (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Skinner, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Kevin Kihnke. (Skinner, Stephen) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for (1) Declaratory Judgment; (2) Breach of Contract; (3) Anticipatory Repudiation of Contract; (4) Insurance Bad Faith; and (5) Violations of Consumer Protection Act against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6851473), filed by KEVIN KIHNKE.(Skinner, Stephen) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where LM Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan E Heck

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela Marie Andrews