This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2020 at 09:51:11 (UTC).

Kieser v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 Kieser filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-06045

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Leonard Kieser

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James P Cannon

Attorney at The Montee Law Firm

Po Box 127

St. Joseph, MO 64502-0127

James Albert Montee

Attorney at Montee Law Firm - StJoe

P.O. Box 127

St. Joseph, MO 64502

Joseph R. Johnson

1641 Worthington Road, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

17Th Street N.W., Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Kara T Stubbs

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2504

John A. Wharton

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Denver

1144 15Th Street, Suite 3300

Denver, CO 80202

Pamela J. Marple

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig - DC

2101 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

#25

24 #1

MAP General Order

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Memo on PTC

#21

#20

#19

7 #1

MAP General Order

#7

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay A. Daugherty(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP re-assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Settlement Conference scheduled for June 16, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. The parties will mediate with Jay Daugherty. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER setting Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. Signed on 5/20/2020 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 5/15/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 01:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed on 5/15/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Robert Leonard Kieser. (Cannon, James) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs filed by James P Cannon on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Leonard Kieser.(Cannon, James) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/21/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 4/14/2020. Signed on 3/31/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 3/31/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01074. (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketRemark - Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-01074-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15359447 filed by Robert Leonard Kieser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Albert Montee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Robert Johnson