This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:21:17 (UTC).

Kientz v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Kientz filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia S. Krieger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03261

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert S. Kientz

Defendants

Commissioner Andrew M. Saul

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Interested Parties

SSA Noticing

USAO-SS-Noticing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meredith E. Marcus

Attorney at Daley Disability Law, P.C.

4256 North Ravenswood Avenue, Suite 104

Chicago, IL 60613

Defendant Attorneys

Narissa C. Webber

Attorney at Social Security Administration-OGC-Denver

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

J. Benedict Garcia

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Case Management Plan) (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

8 #1

Joint Case Management Plan

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration All parties do not consent.. (Webber, Narissa) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document, #8 Continuation of Main Document, #9 Continuation of Main Document, #10 Continuation of Main Document, #11 Continuation of Main Document, #12 Continuation of Main Document, #13 Continuation of Main Document, #14 Continuation of Main Document, #15 Continuation of Main Document, #16 Continuation of Main Document, #17 Continuation of Main Document, #18 Continuation of Main Document, #19 Continuation of Main Document)(Webber, Narissa) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Narissa C. Webber on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Narissa C. Webber added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Webber, Narissa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Case Management Plan) (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#6) Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#3) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX092865. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#7) Utility Setting Answer Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration Answer Due 1/17/2020. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Meredith E. Marcus on behalf of Robert S. Kientz (Marcus, Meredith) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Meredith E. Marcus added to party Robert S. Kientz(pty:pla), filed by Robert S. Kientz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses Combined)(Marcus, Meredith) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less