This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2021 at 09:33:53 (UTC).

Kidwell v. Harmon et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 Kidwell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Harmon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Grady Jennings and Regina S. Edwards. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00505

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alonzo Kidwell

Defendants

Thomas Harmon

Boknecht Trucking, Inc.

Central Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott A. Wallitsch

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan - Louisville

420 W. Liberty Street, Suite 260

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph P. Hummel

Attorney at Sewell & Neal, PLLC

220 W. Main Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202

Robert W. Schrimpf

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress, LPA - Cincinnati

625 Eden Park Drive, Suite 450

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Tyler M. Jolley

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress, LPA - Cincinnati

625 Eden Park Drive, Suite 450

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit state court process and pleadings

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 9/21/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 11/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. See order for call in information.cc:counsel (KJA) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/21/2021; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-RSE. (ARM) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Jolley, Tyler) Modified on 8/13/2021, duplicate text removed (SMJ). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Jolley, Tyler) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boknecht Trucking, Inc.. (Hummel, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Boknecht Trucking, Inc., Thomas Harmon. (Hummel, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court (SRH) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Central Mutual Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-003778. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3396494). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - state court process and pleadings, #2 Cover Sheet) (SRH) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert William Schrimpf

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Hummel