This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2022 at 08:56:14 (UTC).

Kids Ride Shotgun Limited v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Kids Ride Shotgun Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03424

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kids Ride Shotgun Limited

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Dezhou MJ Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd. (1)

Hangzhou Bicycle Technology Co., Ltd. (2)

Hangzhou Lindo Trading Co., Ltd. (3)

Hebei Lian Speed Trading Co., Ltd. (4)

Hebei Qiju Sporting Goods Co., Ltd. (5)

Hongranda International Trade (taicang )co., Ltd. (6)

Ningbo Mik Accessories Co., Ltd. (7)

Shenzhen Shanhai Iot Technology Co., Ltd. (8)

Yangjiang Naersi Industry and Trade Co., Ltd. (9)

Amantes De La Bicicleta Store (10)

Awesome Choices Store (11)

Baker-Car Life Store (12)

BBD Store (13)

Bigg Outdoor Store (14)

BOSSOM Cycling Store (15)

Brave Shop Store (16)

Customized Parts Store (17)

130 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Tom

David Edward Hutchinson

Other Attorneys

David M. Airan

Nicole E. Kopinski

Wallace Hua Feng

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/24/2022 and continued to 10/13/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants Joybuy (138) and Joybuy Express (139)'s unopposed motion to extend deadlines to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint, up to and including October 7, 2022. #36 is granted. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1246152. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (exr, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#37

(#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) by Wallace Hua Feng (Jingdong Ecommerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited) (Feng, Wallace) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#36

(#36) MOTION by Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) for extension of time - UNOPPOSED Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Joybuy and Joybuy Express (Kopinski, Nicole) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#35

(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) by Nicole E. Kopinski (Jingdong Ecommerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited) (Kopinski, Nicole) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#34

(#34) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) by David M. Airan (Jingdong Ecommerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited) (Airan, David) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing set for 8/24/2022 at 10:45 a.m. is stricken and reset to 8/24/2022 at 10:30 a.m. (TIME CHANGE ONLY) The hearing will be via telephone conference. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1246152. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kids Ride Shotgun Limited of Defendant No. 87. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#7

(#7) EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited to , MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited for temporary restraining order (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#6

(#6) EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited to file under seal, MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited to seal document sealed document #3 and Ex. 2 to the Declaration of Thomas Hayward (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kids Ride Shotgun Limited (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. 4 Provisionally Filed Under Seal - Schedule A Slipsheet

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. 3 AO121

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2 AO120

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 IP Registrations

1 #1

Main Document

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/24/2022 and continued to 10/13/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants Joybuy (138) and Joybuy Express (139)'s unopposed motion to extend deadlines to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint, up to and including October 7, 2022. #36 is granted. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1246152. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (exr, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) by Wallace Hua Feng (Jingdong Ecommerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited) (Feng, Wallace) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION by Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) for extension of time - UNOPPOSED Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Joybuy and Joybuy Express (Kopinski, Nicole) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) by Nicole E. Kopinski (Jingdong Ecommerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited) (Kopinski, Nicole) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139) by David M. Airan (Jingdong Ecommerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited) (Airan, David) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing set for 8/24/2022 at 10:45 a.m. is stricken and reset to 8/24/2022 at 10:30 a.m. (TIME CHANGE ONLY) The hearing will be via telephone conference. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1246152. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kids Ride Shotgun Limited of Defendant No. 87. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: lecheste_7 (126), mantraltd (127), onlyhereshop (128), ridewill-ebay (129), ridewill-shop-it (130), royalpritchard (131), sams_sportsandmoreshop_gmbh (132), shoppingismyhappyplace (133), husale.discountshops2021.ru (134), www.luckbq.com (135), Beyarina (136), HUB HOME (137), Joybuy (138), Joybuy Express (139), New Continent (140), Pro Seller (141), Shanghai Huasha Business Consultancy Co.,Ltd. (142), Shenzhen Ruimiaoqian Network Technology Co.,Ltd. (143), WuhanHuixinhengtongMaoyiYouxiangongsi (144), yixingshijinjuguomaoyiyouxiangongsi (145) and JuredonglunjBs (146) added to case caption. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: daliary.com (119), keeptill (120), www.easonco.com (121), edr_davi (122), everythingrated (123), ideeluciola (124) and inspire-photo-video (125) added to case caption. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Kubens (88), kyliNG (89), LcaeIurdlxc (90), LEGVAEV (91), Libing shop (92), linyabaihuoshanghang (93), lisiqi (94), LJSHSD (95), NATRUTH (96), One of the best sellers (97), PanXiaoJing (98), Pvnoocy (99), QIAZNH (100), shanxiruichangkejiyouxiangongsi (101), Shopping in large quantities (102), SSYYTT (103), TaiYuanYiChengKuaJingMaoYiYouXianGongSi520 (104), Thymrim (105), tianyuanshuntianfumaoyiyouxiangongsi (106), VUPUPY store (107), Weneider (108), wouldfair (109), Wzp (110), xieeix (111), XMLY (112), Xuyong shop us (113), You Best home (114), youmeijike (115), YHJX (116), YYMYYM (117) and zhangyanlinbaihuodian (118) added to case caption. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited by Christopher M. Tom (Tom, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 2 of 9) to Hayward Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 3 of 9) to Hayward Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 4 of 9) to Hayward Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 5 of 9) to Hayward Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 6 of 9) to Hayward Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 7 of 9) to Hayward Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 8 of 9) to Hayward Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Part 9 of 9) to Hayward Declaration)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Memo ISO TRO, #2 Declaration Attorney (D. Hutchinson) Declaration, #3 Declaration Client Declaration (Hayward), #4 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited to , MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited for temporary restraining order (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited to file under seal, MOTION by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited to seal document sealed document #3 and Ex. 2 to the Declaration of Thomas Hayward (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kids Ride Shotgun Limited (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kids Ride Shotgun Limited Schedule A to Complaint (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kids Ride Shotgun Limited; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19611327. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 IP Registrations, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 AO120, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 AO121, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Provisionally Filed Under Seal - Schedule A Slipsheet)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less