This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2019 at 08:26:04 (UTC).

Kidder v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Kidder filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02735

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristine Kidder

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A Dalimonte

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Eric Alfred Paine

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

1320 Main Street, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Shane Gibson Ramsey

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

150 Fourth Avenue North, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Dell P Chappell

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

1320 Main St., 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 02/21/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS #9 #10 MOTIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DELL P. CHAPPELL AND ERIC A. PAINE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/18/2019. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214635) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214620) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/29/2019. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01114. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16546791 filed by Kristine Kidder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 02/19/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 02/21/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS #9 #10 MOTIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DELL P. CHAPPELL AND ERIC A. PAINE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/18/2019. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214635) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214620) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/29/2019. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01114. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1114-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16546791 filed by Kristine Kidder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.