This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 08:57:25 (UTC).

Kidd, Jr. v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Kidd, Jr filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn Kimball Mizelle, Thomas G. Wilson and Thomas P. Barber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02460

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judges

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

Thomas P. Barber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Kidd, Jr.

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

WebBank Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Martin Bonan

Attorney at Seraph Legal P.A.

1614 N 19Th Street

Tampa, FL 33605

Brandon David Morgan

Attorney at Seraph Legal, P.A.

1614 N 19Th St

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle James Maury

Attorney at Jones Day

600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3300

Miami, FL 33131

Ailen Cruz

Attorney at Guerra King, P.A.

1408 N. Westshore Blvd., Ste. 1010

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Maury, Kyle) Modified text on 12/17/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 16, 2022 at 9:00 AM before Gregory P. Holder. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#22

(#22) FCRA SCHEDULING ORDER - FAST TRACK. The parties shall mediate no later than MARCH 30, 2022. The Court appoints Gregory P. Holder as mediator. On or before DECEMBER 14, 2021, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice of mediation that states the agreed date and time of mediation. If mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/30/2021. (SRC) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#21

(#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WebBank Corporation.(Cruz, Ailen) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#19

(#19) ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk is directed to reassign by random draw this case to another District Judge. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/15/2021. (JMB) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ailen Cruz on behalf of WebBank Corporation. Lead Counsel: Ailen Cruz. (Cruz, Ailen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by WebBank Corporation. (Cruz, Ailen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#9

(#9) RETURN of service executed on October 28, 2021 by William Kidd, Jr. as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Morgan, Brandon) Modified text on 11/3/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by William Kidd, Jr. (Morgan, Brandon) Modified text on 10/28/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by William Kidd, Jr. Related case(s): No (Morgan, Brandon) Modified text on 10/28/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) CIVIL CASE ORDER. The Court will enter a special scheduling order after any defendant appears in this action. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/21/2021. (JMB) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

#4

1 #4

Proposed Summons (WebBank)

1 #3

Proposed Summons (Experian)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A to C

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Maury, Kyle) Modified text on 12/17/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 16, 2022 at 9:00 AM before Gregory P. Holder. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) FCRA SCHEDULING ORDER - FAST TRACK. The parties shall mediate no later than MARCH 30, 2022. The Court appoints Gregory P. Holder as mediator. On or before DECEMBER 14, 2021, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice of mediation that states the agreed date and time of mediation. If mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/30/2021. (SRC) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WebBank Corporation.(Cruz, Ailen) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(#20) Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:21-cv-2460-TPB-TGW. Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle no longer assigned to the case. (JNB) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk is directed to reassign by random draw this case to another District Judge. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/15/2021. (JMB) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ailen Cruz on behalf of WebBank Corporation. Lead Counsel: Ailen Cruz. (Cruz, Ailen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by WebBank Corporation. (Cruz, Ailen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by WebBank Corporation. Related case(s): No (Cruz, Ailen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer or response is due 12/16/2021. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/12/2021. (JMB) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of service executed on October 28, 2021 by William Kidd, Jr. as to WebBank Corporation. (Morgan, Brandon) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on October 28, 2021 by William Kidd, Jr. as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Morgan, Brandon) Modified text on 11/3/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by William Kidd, Jr. (Morgan, Brandon) Modified text on 10/28/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by William Kidd, Jr. Related case(s): No (Morgan, Brandon) Modified text on 10/28/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL CASE ORDER. The Court will enter a special scheduling order after any defendant appears in this action. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/21/2021. (JMB) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., WebBank Corporation. (JLD) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JLD) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-2460-KKM-TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18839011) filed by William Kidd, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons (Experian), #4 Proposed Summons (WebBank))(Morgan, Brandon) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEBBANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle James Maury

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ailen Cruz