This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2020 at 08:39:07 (UTC).

Khoung v. Wilmington Savings Society, FSB

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Khoung filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wilmington Savings Society, FSB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Amos L. Mazzant, III and Christine A. Nowak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00184

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francis T. Khoung

Defendant

Wilmington Savings Society, FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas C Barron

Attorney at Law Offices of Thomas C. Barron

P. O. Box 14123

Dallas, TX 75214

Defendant Attorney

Mark Douglas Cronenwett

Attorney at Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, PC - Dallas

14160 North Dallas Parkway, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

16 #9

Text of Proposed Order

16 #8

Exhibit A-7

16 #7

Exhibit A-6

16 #6

Exhibit A-5

16 #5

Exhibit A-4

16 #4

Exhibit A-3

16 #3

Exhibit A-2

16 #2

Exhibit A-1

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support, by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB re #9 Notice (Other) of Additional Prior Cases, (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/7/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2020. Discovery due by 9/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 4/17/2020. Mediation Completion due by 9/18/2020. Motions due by 7/10/2020. Proposed Findings of Fact due by 2/12/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/7/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Rule 16 management conference set for Tuesday, May 5, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/7/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#11

(#11) Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB (Proposed Scheduling Order). (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#10

(#10) STATUS REPORT (Joint Conference Report) by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB. (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Francis T. Khoung of Prior Cases (Barron, Thomas) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit to the Court no later than Friday, March 27, 2020, a list of all prior cases and/or other pending litigation related to the subject property and/or relevant to the disposition of the instant matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/13/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support, by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB re #9 Notice (Other) of Additional Prior Cases, (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/7/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2020. Discovery due by 9/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 4/17/2020. Mediation Completion due by 9/18/2020. Motions due by 7/10/2020. Proposed Findings of Fact due by 2/12/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/7/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Rule 16 management conference set for Tuesday, May 5, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/7/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB (Proposed Scheduling Order). (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATUS REPORT (Joint Conference Report) by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB. (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Francis T. Khoung of Prior Cases (Barron, Thomas) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit to the Court no later than Friday, March 27, 2020, a list of all prior cases and/or other pending litigation related to the subject property and/or relevant to the disposition of the instant matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/13/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/13/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/13/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/11/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Petition by Wilmington Savings Society, FSB.(rpc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Wilmington Savings Society, FSB, filed by Francis T. Khoung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rpc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB from 401st Judicial District Court, Collin County, case number 401-01200-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7697659), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit C-1, #9 Exhibit C-2, #10 Exhibit C-3, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less