This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 00:45:24 (UTC).

Aaron Kheriaty v. The Regents of the University of California et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Aaron Kheriaty filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01367

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AARON KHERIATY, M.D.

Aaron Kheriaty

Defendants

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, a corporation

MICHAEL V. DRAKE, in his official capacity as President of the UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

The Regents of The University of California

Michael V. Drake

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caroline V Tucker

Attorney at Siri and Glimstad LLP

700 South Flower Street Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Caroline V. Tucker

Attorney at Siri and Glimstad LLP

700 South Flower Street Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Aaron Siri

Attorney at Siri and Glimstad LLP

2500 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Christopher D Wiest

Attorney at Chris Wiest Attorney at Law PLLC

25 Town Center Boulevard, Suite 104

Crestview Hills, KY 41017

Elizabeth A. Brehm

Attorney at Siri and Glimstad LLP

200 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Defendant Attorneys

Emily T Kuwahara

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

515 South Flower Street 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Charles F Robinson

Attorney at University of California

1111 Franklin Street 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607-5200

Katharine Essick

Attorney at University of California

1111 Franklin Street 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Kristin J Madigan

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Norman J Hamill

Attorney at University of California

1111 Franklin Street 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Suzanne Elizabeth Rode

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Uri Niv

Attorney at Crowell Moring LLP

515 South Flower Street 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Siri APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Aaron Kheriaty, M.D., designating Caroline Tucker as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#34

(#34) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 / Answer of Defendant Michael V. Drake, M.D. to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Michael V. Drake.(Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#33

(#33) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

32 #2

Proposed Order

32 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

32 #32

Main Document

20 #2

Proposed Order

20 #1

Declaration

20 #20

Main Document

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D.. (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D.. (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D., (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D.. (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#1

(#34) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 / Answer of Defendant Michael V. Drake, M.D. to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Michael V. Drake.(Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Siri APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Aaron Kheriaty, M.D., designating Caroline Tucker as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 / Answer of Defendant Michael V. Drake, M.D. to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Michael V. Drake.(Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant The Regents of The University of California. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) REPLY In support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #15 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Kheriaty. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Kheriaty in Suppof His Reply to Defendant's Opposition to His Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of UC Faculty in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to His Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Peter McCullough, M.D. In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Harvey Risch, M.D in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction)(Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge James V. Selna: Denying #25 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (es) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Emily T Kuwahara on behalf of Defendants Michael V. Drake, The Regents of The University of California (Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Emily T Kuwahara on behalf of Defendants Michael V. Drake, The Regents of The University of California (Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply In Support of His Motion For Preliminary Injunction #25 filed by Defendants Michael V. Drake, The Regents of The University of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan, #2 Proposed Order)(Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Withdrawal of MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #21 filed by Defendants Michael V. Drake, The Regents of The University of California. (Kuwahara, Emily) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael V. Drake. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Regents of The University of California. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D.. (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D.. (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D., (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D.. (Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31833854 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AARON KHERIATY, M.D.. (Attorney Caroline V Tucker added to party AARON KHERIATY, M.D.(pty:pla))(Tucker, Caroline) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant