This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:33:28 (UTC).

Khayer v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Khayer filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allyne R. Ross and James Orenstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06860

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allyne R. Ross

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MD Abul Khayer

Defendants

U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Jane Does 1-10

John Does 1-10

Ken Cuccinelli

Kevin McAleenan

ABC Agency 1-10

U.S. Citizenship and Immigrations Services

United States Bureau of Consular Arrairs

USCIS Texas Service Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khagendra Gharti-Chhetry

Attorney at Chhetry & Associates,P.C.

363 Seventh Avenue Suite 1500

New York, NY 10001

Defendant Attorney

Paulina Stamatelos

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

271A Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 1/24/2020. (Taitz, Sarah) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina Stamatelos on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Stamatelos, Paulina) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653146051 (Davis, Kimberly) . (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ABC Agency 1-10, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr, U.S. Citizenship and Immigrations Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, filed by MD Abul Khayer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.