This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 07:59:35 (UTC).

Kharwatnasereddin v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Kharwatnasereddin filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00517

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nour M. Kharwatnasereddin

Defendants

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

Defendant Attorney

Robert Sowell

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

400 W. Washington St., Suite 3100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/14/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case by All Defendants. (Sowell, Robert) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Nour M. Kharwatnasereddin. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Nour M. Kharwatnasereddin. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 3/21/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Nour M. Kharwatnasereddin. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/21/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Nour M. Kharwatnasereddin. (Stoller, David) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nour M. Kharwatnasereddin. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/14/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (BD) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-0517-PGB-DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19329895) filed by Nour M. Kharwatnasereddin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit I-90 denial)(Stoller, David) Modified on 3/11/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Sowell