This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2022 at 07:25:38 (UTC).

Khandelwal et al v. Jaddou et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2022 Khandelwal filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Jaddou. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03662

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samarth Khandelwal

Alok Khandelwal

Defendants

UR M. JADDOU

USCIS Houston Field Office

Antony J Blinken

National Visa Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheridan Gary Green

Defendant Attorney

Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28964509) filed by Alok Khandewal, Samarth Khandelwal.(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 10/23/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #4

Summons

2 #5

Summons

2 #6

Summons

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #5

Summons

3 #6

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Antony J Blinken, Ur M. Jaddou, National Visa Center, USCIS Houston Field Office, filed.(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Attorney General of the United States; Assistant US Attorney, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketSummons Not Issued as to All Defendants due to these deficiencies: Second page of summons needs to be included. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Attorney General of the United States; Assistant US Attorney, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28964509) filed by Alok Khandewal, Samarth Khandelwal.(Green, Sheridan) (Entered: 10/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less