This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 07:22:24 (UTC).

Khan v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Khan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02314

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QAISAR KHAN

Defendants

WAL-MART, INC.

STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. d/b/a STANLEY ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

Stanley Black & Decker, Inc,

Not Classified By Court

F. Robert Santos

Tampa, FL 33606-2560

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Felipe B. Fulgencio

Attorney at Fulgencio Law

105 S. Edison Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Christopher W. Mathena

Attorney at Fulgencio Law, PLLC

105 S. Edison Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Courtney Annette Umberger

Attorney at Fulgencio Law

105 S. Edison Ave.

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia Concepcion

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131-1579

Colby Nicole Ferris

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave, Suite 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

Michael J. Wiggins

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave, Suite 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

Not Classified By Court Attorney

F. Robert Santos

Attorney at Santos & Lynott, PA

1609 W De Leon St Fl 3

Tampa, FL 33606-2560

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#21) ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware that the parties have requested a June 17, 2022, mediation to be held via Zoom videoconference. Given the availability of vaccinations, in-person mediations can be safely conducted with proper precautions in place, such as social distancing and the wearing of masks. The Court firmly believes that in-person mediations are more productive than video mediations, and finds in-person mediation appropriate absent truly exigent circumstances, such as serious health concerns. Thus, the request to mediate remotely is denied at this time. If the parties have such health concerns or issues, they may file supporting documentation in camera in a motion closer to the mediation date. If the Court then permits the mediation to be conducted remotely due to such health issues, the Court will reserve the right to order another round of in person mediation if the mediation is not successful. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/24/2021. (SGM) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER appointing F. Robert Santos as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for June 17, 2022, at 9:00 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/24/2021. (SGM) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 6/17/22 at 9:00 AM before F. Robert Santos. (Umberger, Courtney) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/2/2021. (TWL) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #16), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/2/2021. (TWL) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington Jury Trial set for the January 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/8/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/2/2021. (TWL) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Umberger, Courtney) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc, identifying Other Affiliate Stanley Access Technologies, LLC for Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Ferris, Colby) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 7 Order by Wal-Mart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC for Wal-Mart, Inc. (Concepcion, Patricia) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Qaisar Khan. (Umberger, Courtney) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Concepcion on behalf of Wal-Mart, Inc. (Concepcion, Patricia) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (MCB). (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Wal-Mart, Inc. re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule of Filing Notice of Lead Counsel and Designation of Email (Concepcion, Patricia) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Wal-Mart, Inc's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Wal-Mart, Inc.(Concepcion, Patricia) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (MCB). (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by October 21, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/8/2021. (SGM) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81, Defendant Wal-Mart's answer was due yesterday, October 7, 2021. That date has passed but no answer or motion for extension of time has been filed. And Plaintiff has failed to promptly apply to the Clerk for entry of default. Accordingly, the Court directs Plaintiff to promptly apply to the Clerk for entry of default. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/8/2021. (SGM) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Colby Nicole Ferris on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. Lead Counsel: Michael J. Wiggins. (Ferris, Colby) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Felipe B. Fulgencio on behalf of Qaisar Khan. Lead Counsel: Felipe Fulgencio. (Fulgencio, Felipe) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2314-VMC-AAS. (SJB) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Sixth Judicial Circuit, Pasco County, case number 2021-CA-001921 filed in State Court on 8/18/21. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18767756 filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - COMPLAINT/ State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit B - NOF Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Khan _ Pasco County Property Appraiser, #5 Exhibit Aff of MJW supporting NOR)(Ferris, Colby) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant