This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2022 at 08:31:31 (UTC).

Latifa Khan v. Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2022 Latifa Khan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Josephine L. Staton and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00526

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latifa Khan

Defendants

Citrus Wellness Center, LLC

Ensemble Healthcare LLC

Pacific Wellness GP, LLC

Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC doing business as Alta Vista Healthcare and Wellness Centre

Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP

Does 1 to 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dawn Marie Smith

Defendant Attorney

David Zarmi

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC, Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC. (Attorney David Zarmi added to party Citrus Wellness Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Ensemble Healthcare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Pacific Wellness GP, LLC(pty:dft))(Zarmi, David) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 by Clerk of Court to Judge Josephine L. Staton: Counsel shall refer to the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically File Documents RE Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court and file their Notice of Interested Parties and/or copies, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1. (jp) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #10 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Defendants are ordered to file any Opposition within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order, and any Reply shall be filed within seven (7) days after that. The matter shall be deemed under submission upon receipt of the briefing. The Court will decide the Motion on the briefs unless it otherwise sets a hearing date. (jp) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by plaintiff Latifa Khan #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

10 #7

Proposed Order Proposed Order

10 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5

10 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4

10 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - AO21-01

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint

10 #1

Declaration Declaration of Dawn M. Smith

10 #10

Main Document

9 #6

Exhibit Ex. 5

8 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 2

8 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 1

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Memorandum

8 #8

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC, Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC. (Attorney David Zarmi added to party Citrus Wellness Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Ensemble Healthcare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Pacific Wellness GP, LLC(pty:dft))(Zarmi, David) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 by Clerk of Court to Judge Josephine L. Staton: Counsel shall refer to the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically File Documents RE Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court and file their Notice of Interested Parties and/or copies, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1. (jp) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #10 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Defendants are ordered to file any Opposition within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order, and any Reply shall be filed within seven (7) days after that. The matter shall be deemed under submission upon receipt of the briefing. The Court will decide the Motion on the briefs unless it otherwise sets a hearing date. (jp) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by plaintiff Latifa Khan #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by plaintiff Latifa Khan. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dawn M. Smith, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - AO21-01, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Smith, Dawn) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Plaintiff Latifa Khan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dawn M. Smith, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 AO21-01, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5)(Smith, Dawn) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Attorney David Zarmi added to party Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP (pty:dft)) (Zarmi, David) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON upon filing of the complaint. (droj) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00526 JLS (MARx). (car) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, Does 1-50, Ensemble Healthcare LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation and Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC, Riverside Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Latifa Khan. Filed in State Court on 2/16/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC identifying Citrus Wellness Center, LP as Corporate Parent. (Zarmi, David) (Entered: 03/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC. (Zarmi, David) (Entered: 03/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2200647 Receipt No: ACACDC-33015422 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint) (Attorney David Zarmi added to party RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC(pty:dft))(Zarmi, David) (Entered: 03/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less