This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2020 at 07:47:38 (UTC).

Khan et al v. Acting Secretary Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Khan filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Acting Secretary Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02157

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ghias Azam

Asima Khan

Defendants

Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean

John Doe

Secretary Mike Pompeo

Kevin K. McAleenan

Michael Borgen

William P. Barr

Christopher A. Wray

Kenneth T Cuccinnelli

Paul W Jones

Secretary, US Department of State

Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations

Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services

U.S. Attorney General

Director, Citizenship & Immigration Services

Charge` d' Affaires, Islamabad

District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida

Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Consular Officer. Islamabad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shahzad Ahmed

Attorney at Brink Ahmed Immigration

5401 S. Kirkman Rd., Suite. 105

Orlando, FL 32819

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of service by Ghias Azam, Asima Khan OF TRACK ONE NOTICE. (Ahmed, Shahzad) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Charge` d' Affaires, Islamabad, Consular Officer. Islamabad, Director, Citizenship & Immigration Services, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida, Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, US Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ghias Azam, Asima Khan. Related case(s): no (Ahmed, Shahzad) Modified on 11/14/2019 (SPM). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ghias Azam, Asima Khan . (Ahmed, Shahzad) Modified on 11/14/2019 (SPM). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2157-Orl-40GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Issuance of Writ of Mandamus and/or Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400, Receipt #113A-16133498) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons US Attorney's Office, #4 Proposed Summons FBI, #5 Proposed Summons USCIS Orlando, #6 Proposed Summons Consular Officer, #7 Proposed Summons USCIS Director, #8 Proposed Summons Acting Secretary Office General Counsel, #9 Proposed Summons USCIS District Director, #10 Proposed Summons Secretary Dept of State, #11 Proposed Summons Charge D' Affaires US Embassy Islamabad, #12 Proposed Summons US Attorney General)(Ahmed, Shahzad) Modified on 11/14/2019 to correct docket text (SJB). Modified on 11/14/2019 (SPM). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, U.S. Department of State is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTOR FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida is a litigant