This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 07:23:49 (UTC).

Khan et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Khan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-18537

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAOMI KHAN

Lynda Santillan

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

& JOHNSON JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.

Hattenhauer Distributing Company a domestic business corporation doing business as Heights Fieldstop

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Hull

Attorney at Bruster PLLC

680 N. Carroll Ave., Suite 110

Southlake, TX 76092

Ryan Scott Jennings

Attorney at The Gatti Law Firm

235 Front St. Se

Salem, OR 97301

Anthony Kyle Bruster

Attorney at Bruster PLLC

680 N. Carroll Ave., Suite 110

Southlake, TX 76092

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J. Lee

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC NJ BAR

1211 Sw Fifth Avenue, Ste. 1800

Portland, OR 97204

Aukjen Ingraham

Attorney at Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt

1211 Sw 5Th Ave, Ste. 1900

Portland, OR 97204

Jeffrey S. Eden

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDCNJ BAR

1211 Sw Fifth Avenue, Ste. 1800

Portland, OR 97204

Joshua P. Dennis

Attorney at Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt

1211 Sw 5Th Ave, Ste. 1900

Portland, OR 97204

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

Samuel K. Anderson

Attorney at Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua, PC

200 Sw Market St., Suite 1800

Portland, OR 97201-5745

Carl E. Forsberg

Attorney at Forsberg & Umlauf, P.S.

901 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1400

Seattle, WA 98164

Micah R. Steinhilb

Attorney at Forsberg & Umlauf

901 Fifth Avenue, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

23 #1

*Restricted*

23 #23

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#22

#20

#19

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Anthony K. Bruster with Exhibits 1-4

11 #11

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Venessa Wickline Gribble's Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit B - Fred Meyer's Consent

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court File

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 3:21-cv-01054. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: Transferring this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Pursuant to MDL 2738, Docket No. 2758. Certified on 10/13/2021 by Deputy Clerk Daniel Murphy of the District of New Jersey. (dsg) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER - In light of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel's order transferring this action to the District of New Jersey for coordinated or consolidated proceedings, this Court rescinds the requirement in its Order of October 5, 2021, (ECF #20 ) directing Plaintiffs to file their Motion to Remand within 10 days of that Order and reinstates the stay in this case. See In re Phenylpropanolamine (PPA) Prod. Liab. Litig., 460 F.3d 1217, 1230 (9th Cir. 2006) ("A transfer is effective when the order of transfer is 'filed in the office of the clerk of the district court of the transferee district.' 28 U.S.C. 1407(c). When the transfer becomes effective, the jurisdiction of the transferor court ceases and the transferee court has exclusive jurisdiction." (quotation marks omitted)). Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER - The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay (ECF #11 ). The stay in this case is lifted for purposes of litigating Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Motion to Remand within 10 days of this Order, and the remaining briefing will follow in due course. The Court also allows appropriate jurisdictional discovery. Signed on 10/5/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Reply Plaintiff's' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay to Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and Supporting Memorandum #11 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruster, Anthony) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Amended Response in Opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and Supporting Memorandum #11 . Filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Ingraham, Aukjen) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Response in Opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and Supporting Memorandum #11 . Filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Ingraham, Aukjen) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance of Carl E. Forsberg appearing on behalf of Hattenhauer Distributing Company. Filed by Hattenhauer Distributing Company. (Forsberg, Carl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance of Micah R. Steinhilb appearing on behalf of Hattenhauer Distributing Company. Filed by Hattenhauer Distributing Company. (Steinhilb, Micah) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Stay of All Proceedings (ECF #7 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Stay All Proceedings. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Lee, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.., Johnson & Johnson. (Lee, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/13/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 12/13/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (joha) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. Filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Lee, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement for Johnson & Johnson. Filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Lee, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Plaintiffs of Removal of Action Under 28 USC Sections 1332 and 1441(a) (Diversity of Citizenship) Filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Lee, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV18913 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8156587 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Fred Meyer's Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Venessa Wickline Gribble's Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lee, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Scott Jennings(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Kyle Bruster