This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 07:22:45 (UTC).

Khan et al v. Crown Asset Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Khan filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Crown Asset Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter J. Messitte and George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01914

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Peter J. Messitte

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAHID KHAN

Quincy Jones

Defendants

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Prosper Funding, LLC

Prosper Marketplace Inc.

Velocity Investments, LLC

Crown Asset Management, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Howard Carney

Attorney at Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd

100 W Pennsylvania Ave Ste 100

Towson, MD 21204

Richard S Gordon

Attorney at Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd

100 W Pennsylvania Ave Ste 100

Towson, MD 21204

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew P Previn

Attorney at Buckley LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas, Suite 3100

New York, NY 10036

Lauren L Erker

Attorney at Buckley LLP

201 Mission Street 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael A Rome

Attorney at Buckley LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1000

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

23 #2

Text of Proposed Order

23 #1

Exhibit

#23

22 #2

Exhibit

22 #1

Memorandum in Support

#22

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

20 #23

Exhibit W - Judge Albrights Memorandum

1 #18

Exhibit 18 - Notice of Removal filed in Crown (without exhibits)

1 #17

Exhibit 17 - Notice of Removal filed in Jones (without exhibits)

1 #15

Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Peter Durham

1 #14

Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Dominic C. Mazzone

1 #13

Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Brian Williams

1 #12

Exhibit 12 - Complaint, Khan v. Crown Asset Management, LLC, No. 8:21-cv-01126-G

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Amended Complaint (No. 485569V)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Orders granting pro hac vice motions for M. Previn, M. Rome and L. E

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint Petitioning to Stay Arbitration

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (22-23) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STATE COURT MOTION for Summary Judgment by Quincy Jones, Shahid Khan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATE COURT MOTION to Dismiss by Crown Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings by Quincy Jones, Shahid Khan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Crown Asset Management, LLC., Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC Certification of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Instructions for Service, #3 Exhibit C - Request for Assignment to Business and Technology Case Management Program, #4 Exhibit D - Notice, New Case Number, #5 Exhibit E - Administrative Judges Check Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs Line Filing Rule 16-308 (C) Statement, #7 Exhibit G - Notice, New Case Number, #8 Exhibit H - Line Entering Appearance of Counsel, #9 Exhibit I - Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Exhibit J - Motion for Special Admission of Counsel, #11 Exhibit K - Motion for Special Admission of Counsel, #12 Exhibit L - Motion for Special Admission of Counsel, #13 Exhibit M - Notice of Existing Schedule, #14 Exhibit N - Notice of Existing Schedule, #15 Exhibit O - Notice of Existing Schedule, #16 Exhibit P - Motion to Dismiss, #17 Exhibit Q - Motion for Summary Judgment, #18 Exhibit R - Plaintiffs Instructions for Service, #19 Exhibit S - Notice of Existing Schedule, #20 Exhibit T - Scheduling Order, #21 Exhibit U - Plaintiffs Scheduling Hearing Statement, #22 Exhibit V - Defendants Scheduling Hearing Statement, #23 Exhibit W - Judge Albrights Memorandum, #24 Exhibit X - Affidavit of Service, #25 Exhibit Y - Docket Sheet indicating chambers docket entries at Tab nos. 37 and 38, #26 Exhibit Z - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lauren L Erker. Directing attorney Lauren L Erker to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael A Rome. Directing attorney Michael A Rome to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren L. Erker (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9432654.) by Crown Asset Management, LLC., Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. Rome (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9432624.) by Crown Asset Management, LLC., Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Crown Asset Management, LLC., Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC re #10 Standing Order Concerning Removal Defendants' Statement Concerning Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crown Asset Management, LLC., Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC, filed by Shahid Khan, Quincy Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Redline Version)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Crown Asset Management, LLC., filed by Shahid Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Peter J. Messitte no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Velocity Investments, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Velocity Portfolio Goup, Inc. for Velocity Investments, LLC.(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Corporation, Other Affiliate AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate BillGuard,Inc., Other Affiliate Prosper Warehouse II Trust, Other Affiliate Prosper Marketplace Issuance Trust, Series 2019-4, Other Affiliate Prosper Healthcare Lending LLC, Other Affiliate Prosper Warehouse I Trust, Other Affiliate Prosper Marketplace Issuance Trust, Series 2019-1, Other Affiliate Prosper Marketplace Issuance Trust, Series 2019-2, Other Affiliate Prosper Grantor Trust, Other Affiliate Prosper Depositor LLC for Prosper Marketplace Inc.; Other Affiliate Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Corporation, Other Affiliate AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate BillGuard,Inc., Other Affiliate Prosper Warehouse II Trust, Other Affiliate Prosper Marketplace Issuance Trust, Series 2019-4, Other Affiliate Prosper Healthcare Lending LLC, Other Affiliate Prosper Warehouse I Trust, Other Affiliate Prosper Marketplace Issuance Trust, Series 2019-1, Other Affiliate Prosper Marketplace Issuance Trust, Series 2019-2, Other Affiliate Prosper Grantor Trust, Other Affiliate Prosper Depositor LLC for Prosper Funding, LLC.(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CAM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Prosper Marketplace Inc., Other Affiliate Prosper Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate BKWJAT Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Soldi, LLC, Other Affiliate ValorBridge Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate CAM1, LLC, Other Affiliate Second Round Sub, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Second Round Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Hiscox, Inc. for CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P Previn on behalf of CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC (Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Notice of Consent to Removal (Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc., Velocity Investments, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Attaching Civil Cover Sheet (Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, Maryland, case number 485569V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9408144), filed by Velocity Investments, LLC, Prosper Funding, LLC, Prosper Marketplace Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint Petitioning to Stay Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order, B&T Track Assignment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Scheduling Hearing & Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - 05.19.2021 Summons to Crown Asset Management, LLC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order granting Motion for Extension, #6 Exhibit 6 - Orders granting pro hac vice motions for M. Previn, M. Rome and L. Erker, #7 Exhibit 7 - Amended Complaint (No. 485569V), #8 Exhibit 8 - 07.15.2021 Summons to PMI, PFL, Velocity, #9 Exhibit 9 - Scheduling & Pretrail Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - State Court Docket (No. 485569V), #11 Exhibit 11 - Complaint, Jones v. Prosper, No. 8:21-cv-00893-GJH, #12 Exhibit 12 - Complaint, Khan v. Crown Asset Management, LLC, No. 8:21-cv-01126-GJH, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Brian Williams, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Dominic C. Mazzone, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Peter Durham, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of James Harkins, #17 Exhibit 17 - Notice of Removal filed in Jones (without exhibits), #18 Exhibit 18 - Notice of Removal filed in Crown (without exhibits), #19 Exhibit 19 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Previn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prosper Marketplace, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Prosper Funding (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant