This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2021 at 12:11:14 (UTC).

Khader v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Khader filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04632

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Khaja M M Khader

Defendants

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Microsoft

Facebook

Valve Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Edward A Devries

Attorney at Wilson Elser Oskowitz Edelman & Dickler LLP

55 W. Monroe St., Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Mack Harrison Shultz, Jr.

Attorney at Perkins Coie Llp

1201 3Rd Avenue, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Kathleen A. Stetsko

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Jeffrey L. Widman

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

321 North Clark Street, 16Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Joseph Lawrence Cohen

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

321 North Clark Street, 16Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Vincent Michael Casieri

Attorney at Schueler, Dallavo & Casier

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 6150

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #26 and motion for joinder/dismiss #29 are entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motions by 12/1/2021; Defendants Valve Corporation and Microsoft shall reply by 12/15/2021.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#29

(#29) MOTION by Defendant Microsoft for joinder , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Microsoft (Stetsko, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#28

(#28) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Microsoft (Stetsko, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#27

(#27) MEMORANDUM by Valve Corporation in support of motion to dismiss #26 complaint (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#26

(#26) MOTION by Defendant Valve Corporation to dismiss complaint (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#25

(#25) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Valve Corporation by Joseph Lawrence Cohen (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#24

(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Valve Corporation by Jeffrey L. Widman (Widman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#23

(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant's motion to dismiss #20 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 12/1/2021; Defendant Samsung shall reply by 12/15/2021.Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel #22 is granted. Attorney Vincent Michael Casieri is terminated and substitute counsel shall file his appearance as counsel for the Defendant.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#22

(#22) MOTION by Attorney Vincent M Casieri to withdraw as attorney for Valve Corporation. No party information provided, MOTION by Defendant Valve Corporation to substitute attorney Joseph L. Cohen (Casieri, Vincent) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Devries, Edward) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#20

(#20) MOTION by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Dismiss (Devries, Edward) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement #18 , a scheduling order will be entered (if appropriate) after the court rules on the motions to dismiss. The status hearing set for 11/5/2021 #6 is stricken and re-set for 12/3/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#18

(#18) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Devries, Edward) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #14 is granted. The deadline for Defendant Microsoft to file a responsive pleading is extended to 11/12/2021. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

#4

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #26 and motion for joinder/dismiss #29 are entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motions by 12/1/2021; Defendants Valve Corporation and Microsoft shall reply by 12/15/2021.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION by Defendant Microsoft for joinder , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Microsoft (Stetsko, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Microsoft (Stetsko, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEMORANDUM by Valve Corporation in support of motion to dismiss #26 complaint (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION by Defendant Valve Corporation to dismiss complaint (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Valve Corporation by Joseph Lawrence Cohen (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Valve Corporation by Jeffrey L. Widman (Widman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant's motion to dismiss #20 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 12/1/2021; Defendant Samsung shall reply by 12/15/2021.Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel #22 is granted. Attorney Vincent Michael Casieri is terminated and substitute counsel shall file his appearance as counsel for the Defendant.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION by Attorney Vincent M Casieri to withdraw as attorney for Valve Corporation. No party information provided, MOTION by Defendant Valve Corporation to substitute attorney Joseph L. Cohen (Casieri, Vincent) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Devries, Edward) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Dismiss (Devries, Edward) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement #18 , a scheduling order will be entered (if appropriate) after the court rules on the motions to dismiss. The status hearing set for 11/5/2021 #6 is stricken and re-set for 12/3/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Devries, Edward) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #14 is granted. The deadline for Defendant Microsoft to file a responsive pleading is extended to 11/12/2021. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Facebook, Microsoft, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Valve Corporation (exr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Khaja M M Khader (exr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (exr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Khaja M M Khader (exr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Valve Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant