This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2021 at 08:49:06 (UTC).

KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC et al v. FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PETRESE B. TUCKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00609

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETRESE B. TUCKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL SOCCER LLC

RIVERTOWN DEVELOPERS, L.P.

FC PENNSYLVANIA STADIUM LLC

KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC

KSE U2 LLC

RIVERTOWN, TCI, LP

Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC.

CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI

Attorney at SALTZ, MONGELUZZI, BARRETT & BENDESKY, P.C.

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, 52Nd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SAMUEL B. DORDICK

Attorney at SALTZ MONGELUZZI & BENDESKY PC

1650 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MARNI BERGER

Attorney at Saltz Mongeluzzi & Bendesky P.C.

1650 Market St. Fl 52, One Liberty Place, 1600 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEFFREY P. GOODMAN

Attorney at SALTZ MONGELUZZI & BENDESKY PC

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St 52Nd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID NEWMANN

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1735 Market Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JASON MICHAEL RUSSELL

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1735 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JASMEET K. AHUJA

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1735 Market St 23Rd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint by CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#20

(#20) Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

11 #7

Exhibit F

11 #6

Exhibit E

11 #5

Exhibit D

11 #4

Exhibit C

11 #3

Exhibit B

11 #2

Exhibit A

#11

(#20) Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

1 #10

Designation Form

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - Affidavit of Rebecca Collins - Chubb Group Holdings

1 #7

Exhibit G - Affidavit of Rebecca Collins - Chubb INA Holdings

1 #6

Exhibit F - Affidavit of Brandon Peene - Keystone Sports

1 #5

Exhibit E - Civil Docket Report

1 #4

Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service - Federal Insurance Company

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service - Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14904557), filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint along with the two supporting documents filed in the State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service - Chubb Ina Holdings, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service - Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service - Federal Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Docket Report, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Brandon Peene - Keystone Sports, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Rebecca Collins - Chubb INA Holdings, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Rebecca Collins - Chubb Group Holdings, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Designation Form)(NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint by CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 4/8/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/29/21. 3/29/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to answer, respond or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FC PENNSYLVANIA STADIUM LLC, KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC, KSE U2 LLC, PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL SOCCER LLC, RIVERTOWN DEVELOPERS, L.P., RIVERTOWN, TCI, LP. *FOR.PDFS SEE DOCS. #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 *(lisad, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by RIVERTOWN, TCI, LP. (BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by RIVERTOWN DEVELOPERS, L.P.. (BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL SOCCER LLC. (BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by KSE U2 LLC. (BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC. (BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JASMEET K. AHUJA on behalf of CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (AHUJA, JASMEET) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#9) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL B. DORDICK on behalf of FC PENNSYLVANIA STADIUM LLC, KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC, KSE U2 LLC, PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL SOCCER LLC, RIVERTOWN DEVELOPERS, L.P., RIVERTOWN, TCI, LP with Certificate of Service(DORDICK, SAMUEL) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MARNI BERGER on behalf of FC PENNSYLVANIA STADIUM LLC, KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC, KSE U2 LLC, PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL SOCCER LLC, RIVERTOWN DEVELOPERS, L.P., RIVERTOWN, TCI, LP (BERGER, MARNI) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. GOODMAN on behalf of FC PENNSYLVANIA STADIUM LLC, KEYSTONE SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT LLC, KSE U2 LLC, PENNSYLVANIA PROFESSIONAL SOCCER LLC, RIVERTOWN DEVELOPERS, L.P., RIVERTOWN, TCI, LP with Certificate of Service(GOODMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/16/2021. 2/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION for an Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead by CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (NEWMANN, DAVID) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 2/18/2021 (lisad, ). (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON MICHAEL RUSSELL on behalf of CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (RUSSELL, JASON) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Chubb INA Holdings Inc.; Chubb Group Holdings Inc.; and Chubb Limited with Certificate of Service by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14904557), filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., CHUBB INA HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint along with the two supporting documents filed in the State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service - Chubb Ina Holdings, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service - Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service - Federal Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Docket Report, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Brandon Peene - Keystone Sports, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Rebecca Collins - Chubb INA Holdings, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Rebecca Collins - Chubb Group Holdings, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Designation Form)(NEWMANN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHUBB INA HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHUBB GROUP HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASMEET K. AHUJA