This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 20:40:26 (UTC).

KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF v. TRAGER CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against TRAGER CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17067

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF

Respondent

TRAGER CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRADLEY MARK PARSONS

Attorney at KROLL HEINEMEN CARTON LLC

99 Wood Avenue South, Suite 307

Iselin, NJ 08830

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT in the sum of $650.00 as directed by the Arbitrator in favor of Petitioner KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF against Respondent TRAGER CONSTRUCTION ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/16/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; that the Opinion and Award of J.J. Pierson dated July 3, 2019 shall be and is hereby CONFIRMED; that Respondent shall make payment to the Funds in the amount of $650.00 asdirected by the Arbitrator; that Respondent shall submit to an audit, and produce any and all information requested by the Funds in this regard, on or before September 30, 2019, in light of the fact that the time directed by the Arbitrator for an audit has elapsed.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/16/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

2 #4

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

2 #3

JUDGMENT

2 #2

ORDER

2 #1

STATEMENT

#2

(#2) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT, #2 ORDER, #3 JUDGMENT, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #2

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #1

COVER LETTER

#1

(#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912561.), filed by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT in the sum of $650.00 as directed by the Arbitrator in favor of Petitioner KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF against Respondent TRAGER CONSTRUCTION ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/16/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; that the Opinion and Award of J.J. Pierson dated July 3, 2019 shall be and is hereby CONFIRMED; that Respondent shall make payment to the Funds in the amount of $650.00 asdirected by the Arbitrator; that Respondent shall submit to an audit, and produce any and all information requested by the Funds in this regard, on or before September 30, 2019, in light of the fact that the time directed by the Arbitrator for an audit has elapsed.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/16/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT, #2 ORDER, #3 JUDGMENT, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912561.), filed by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.