This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 20:40:29 (UTC).

KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF v. THOMPSON INTERIORS

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against THOMPSON INTERIORS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward S. Kiel and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17076

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF

Respondent

THOMPSON INTERIORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRADLEY MARK PARSONS

Attorney at KROLL HEINEMEN CARTON LLC

99 Wood Avenue South, Suite 307

Iselin, NJ 08830

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

2 #1

STATEMENT

2 #4

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

2 #3

JUDGMENT

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF against THOMPSON INTERIORS, Respondent shall cease and desist from violating the Trust Agreements by refusing to submit to an audit as directed by the Arbitrator, Respondent shall make a payment to the Funds in the amount of $650.00 as directed by the Arbitrator, Respondent shall submit to an audit, and produce any and all information requested by the Funds in this regard, on or before November 29, 2019 in light of the fact that the time directed by the Arbitrator for audit has elapsed.***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/12/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #1

COVER LETTER

2 #2

ORDER

#2

(#2) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT, #2 ORDER, #3 JUDGMENT, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/12/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #2

CIVIL COVER SHEET

#1

(#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913088.), filed by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF against THOMPSON INTERIORS, Respondent shall cease and desist from violating the Trust Agreements by refusing to submit to an audit as directed by the Arbitrator, Respondent shall make a payment to the Funds in the amount of $650.00 as directed by the Arbitrator, Respondent shall submit to an audit, and produce any and all information requested by the Funds in this regard, on or before November 29, 2019 in light of the fact that the time directed by the Arbitrator for audit has elapsed.***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/12/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/12/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT, #2 ORDER, #3 JUDGMENT, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913088.), filed by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.