This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 20:40:24 (UTC).

KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF v. SKY HIGH MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against SKY HIGH MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leda D. Wettre and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17065

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF

Respondent

SKY HIGH MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRADLEY MARK PARSONS

Attorney at KROLL HEINEMEN CARTON LLC

99 Wood Avenue South, Suite 307

Iselin, NJ 08830

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #2

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #1

COVER LETTER

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm Arbitration award. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/14/2020. (lag, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912473.), filed by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

2 #1

STATEMENT

2 #3

JUDGMENT

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF against SKY HIGH MANAGEMENT LLC in the amount of $123,005.16 ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/14/2020. (lag, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

2 #4

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

#2

(#2) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT, #2 ORDER, #3 JUDGMENT, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

2 #2

ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF against SKY HIGH MANAGEMENT LLC in the amount of $123,005.16 ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/14/2020. (lag, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm Arbitration award. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/14/2020. (lag, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketJudge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT, #2 ORDER, #3 JUDGMENT, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912473.), filed by KEYSTONE MOUNTAIN LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS AS SUCCESSORS TO NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(PARSONS, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less