This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2021 at 10:05:50 (UTC).

Keystone Global, LLC v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On February 17, 2021, Keystone Global, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Keystone”), represented by Jeffrey L. Eichen of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Walmart Inc. (“Defendant” or “Walmart”), seeking permanent injunction, damages and other relief under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for allegedly infringing Keystone’s intellectual property relating to protective devices for vehicles, the devices comprising in part stabilizer blocks disposed on and/or formed integrally with the base of the device. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Delaware with Judge Richard G. Andrews presiding.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendant has infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Numbers 8,850,727 relating to a device for attaching a license plate to a vehicle, including in certain claims a license plate frame having pyramid shaped extensions (“the ‘727 Patent”), 7,866,715 (“the ‘715 Patent”) and 8,047,601 (“the ‘601 Patent” which generally generally claim protective devices for vehicles, the devices comprising in part stabilizer blocks disposed on and/or formed integrally with the base of the device (collectively the “Patents-In-Suit”).

 

The Plaintiff in its complaint alleged that “Keystone reported the infringing listings to Walmart using its online reporting tool. Keystone provided all the information requested by the online reporting tool regarding the infringing products. Walmart confirmed receipt of Keystone’s online infringement report but thereafter took no further action to remove the infringing products from its website.” The Plaintiff also alleged that “Walmart’s legal department has repeatedly denied any responsibility for removing the infringing product listings from Walmart’s website because, according to Walmart, such products originate from Marketplace Retailers.”

 

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “Walmart has the ability to remove listings for infringing products sold by Marketplace Retailers through Walmart’s website. Upon information and belief, Walmart has the legal right to remove listings when a Marketplace Retailer’s product infringes a third party’s intellectual property rights. Upon information and belief, Walmart collects fees from the sale of all Marketplace Retailer products sold through Walmart’s website, including Marketplace Retailer products for which Walmart knows (or should know through receipt of actual notice) there is a claim of patent infringement.” and that “Walmart, having received actual and constructive notice of Keystone’s patent rights and further continuing to infringe such rights, has willfully and intentionally infringed Keystone’s Patents-In-Suit.

 

Two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff are for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘727 Patent, the ‘715 Patent and ‘601 Patent respectively.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order awarding damages to Plaintiff but in no event less than a reasonable royalty, plus pre- and post-judgment interest, also award exemplary damages to Keystone in an amount equal to three times the actual damages and profits awarded pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284. Plaintiff also requested the court to pass permanently enjoining Walmart pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 283 from importing, offering for sale and selling, or inducing any third party from importing, offering for sale or selling, any product which infringes Keystone’s patent rights along with costs of action. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keystone Global, LLC

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey L. Eichen

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,850,727 B2 ; US 7,866,715 B2 ; and US 8,047,601 B2. (sam) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3528258) - filed by Keystone Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) Modified on 2/24/2021 (nms). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keystone Global, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant