Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 11:04:45 (UTC).

KeySee Software Ltd. v. Digital Receiver Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On March 2, 2021, KeySee Software Ltd. (“KeySee” or “Plaintiff”) represented by Ahmed Jamal Davis of Fish and Richardson PC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Digital Receiver Technology, Inc. (“DRT” or “Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief, damages among other relief for allegedly infringing Keysee’s intellectual property relating to the to cryptanalysis methods and systems, and more particularly to cryptanalysis methods and systems enabling interception and decryption of encrypted wireless communications. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Maryland with Judge Peter J. Messitte presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff alleges that the Defendants have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Numbers 8,009,826 entitled “Cryptoanalysis Method and System.” (“the ’826 patent”), 8,295,477 entitled “Cryptoanalysis Method and System.” (“the ’477 patent”), 9,038,192 entitled “Cryptoanalysis Method and System.” (“the ’192 patent”) and 10,447,666 entitled “Cryptoanalysis Method and System.” (“the ’666 patent”) owned by KeySee (collectively “Patents-in-Suit”). 

 

Plaintiff in its complaint alleged that “Because access to the DRT Wireless Interception Products and in particular its code is limited to DRT and possibly to its customers, and because DRT does not publicize details of how its Wireless Interception Products intercept and decrypt encrypted GSM wireless communications, KeySee has been unable to establish with certainty that the DRT Wireless Interception Products infringe the KeySee Cryptanalysis Patents. Nonetheless, upon information and belief based on a reasonable investigation under the circumstances, there are no known methods for ciphertext-only cryptanalysis of encrypted GSM wireless communications that do not infringe at least one claim of each of the KeySee Cryptanalysis Patents. Accordingly, KeySee has a good-faith, reasonable belief that the DRT manufacture and sale of the Wireless Interception Products directly or indirectly infringe at least one claim of each of the KeySee Cryptanalysis Patents.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “KeySee alleges that DRT has made, used, sold, and offered for sale within the United States, and is currently making, using, selling, and offering for sale within the United States, systems, including at least the Wireless Interception Products, that are covered by at least one claim, or that perform methods covered by at least one claim, of each of the KeySee Cryptanalysis Patents.”

 

Four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff are for the infringement of one or more claims of the ’826 patent, the ’477 patent, the ’192 patent and the ’666 patent respectively. 

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that DRT has infringed one or more claims of the Asserted Patents, permanently enjoining Defendant from infringing the Asserted Patents. Plaintiff further requested the court to award Plaintiff damages along with prejudgment and post-judgment interest, order an accounting for acts of alleged infringement not presented at trial, treble the damages awarded to KeySee under 35 U.S.C § 284 and award costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00534

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Messitte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KeySee Software Ltd.

Defendant

Digital Receiver Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ahmed Jamal Davis

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

1000 Maine Ave, S.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Thomas H Reger, II

Attorney at Fish and Richardson

1717 Main St., Ste. 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Carl E Bruce

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Ste 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

John-Paul Fryckman

Attorney at Fish and Richardson

12860 El Camino Real, Ste #400

San Diego, CA 92130

Lawrence K Kolodney

Attorney at Fish and Richardson

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KeySee Software Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas H. Reger II (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9159918.) by KeySee Software Ltd.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence K. Kolodney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9152764.) by KeySee Software Ltd.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John-Paul Fryckman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9152758.) by KeySee Software Ltd.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Digital Receiver Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9138094.), filed by KeySee Software Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

13 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (until May 12, 2021). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/26/2021. (jmhs, Chambers) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KeySee Software Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas H Reger, II. Directing attorney Thomas H Reger, II to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lawrence K Kolodney. Directing attorney Lawrence K Kolodney to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John-Paul Fryckman. Directing attorney John-Paul Fryckman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas H. Reger II (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9159918.) by KeySee Software Ltd.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carl E Bruce. Directing attorney Carl E Bruce to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence K. Kolodney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9152764.) by KeySee Software Ltd.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John-Paul Fryckman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9152758.) by KeySee Software Ltd.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carl E. Bruce (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9152744.) by KeySee Software Ltd.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KeySee Software Ltd.. Digital Receiver Technology, Inc. served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021.(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Digital Receiver Technology, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge George Jarrod Hazel no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by KeySee Software Ltd. (Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by KeySee Software Ltd. (Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Digital Receiver Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9138094.), filed by KeySee Software Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Davis, Ahmed) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Digital Receiver Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence K. Kolodney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carl Edward Bruce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Howard Reger, II