This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 07:27:59 (UTC).

Keys v. Sam's West, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Keys filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sam's West, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Keys

Defendant

Sam's West, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles S. Jackson

Attorney at Hicks & Brasier, PLLC

2630 S. Jones Boulevard

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Beckstead

Attorney at Phillips Spallas & Angstadt, LLP

504 S. Ninth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Robert K. Phillips

Attorney at Phillips, Spallas & Angstadt LLC

504 S. Ninth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

7 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement

7 #1

Exhibit Commissioner's Decision on Request for Exemption

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. Replies due by 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Commissioner's Decision on Request for Exemption, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement) (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Pamela Keys. Responses due by 2/1/2022. (Jackson, Charles) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pamela Keys. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jackson, Charles) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/13/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Kelly Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/28/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sam's West, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

1 #6

Exhibit Settlement Offer

1 #5

Exhibit Request for Exemption

1 #4

Exhibit Answer

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/3/2022. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 3/24/2022. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. Replies due by 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Commissioner's Decision on Request for Exemption, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement) (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Pamela Keys. Responses due by 2/1/2022. (Jackson, Charles) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pamela Keys. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jackson, Charles) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/13/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Kelly Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/28/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sam's West, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Beckstead, Matthew) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-21-837757-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6760925) by Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Exhibit Request for Exemption, #6 Exhibit Settlement Offer) (Beckstead, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sam's West, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Beckstead

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert K. Phillips