This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:01:30 (UTC).

Key v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Key filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03366

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gretchen Key

Defendant

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan L. Lurie

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue, 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Ari Yale Basser

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue, 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Robert L. Starr

Attorney at Law Office of Robert L. Starr APC

23901 Calabasas Road, Suite 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Dyanne Jinhyung Cho

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th St., Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Eric Y Kizirian

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Yale Basser (Basser, Ari) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

4 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-575783. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13434601). Filed byBMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint attached - Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW of North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BMW (US) Holding Corp., Other Affiliate BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH, Other Affiliate BMW International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Bayerische Motoren Werke AG for BMW of North America, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Cho, Dyanne) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Lurie (Lurie, Jordan) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The deadline for plaintiff to file opposition is extended to August 30, 2019, the deadline for defendant to file its reply is extended to September 13, 2019, and the hearing on the motion is continued to October 4, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to November 15, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#9

(#9) Request for Judicial Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed byBMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

8 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

8 #2

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT BMW'S TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Cho, Dyanne) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by BMW of North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit A

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, #11 Order on Stipulation,,., Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #11 Order on Stipulation,, Opposition due by 8/30/2019. Reply due by 9/13/2019. Motion Hearing reset to 10/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 11/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The deadline for plaintiff to file opposition is extended to August 30, 2019, the deadline for defendant to file its reply is extended to September 13, 2019, and the hearing on the motion is continued to October 4, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to November 15, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Judicial Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed byBMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by BMW of North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Yale Basser (Basser, Ari) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Lurie (Lurie, Jordan) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT BMW'S TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Cho, Dyanne) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW of North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BMW (US) Holding Corp., Other Affiliate BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH, Other Affiliate BMW International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Bayerische Motoren Werke AG for BMW of North America, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Cho, Dyanne) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-575783. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13434601). Filed byBMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint attached - Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.