This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2020 at 09:16:26 (UTC).

Key III et al v. Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Key III filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jonathan Key

Hugo Key III

Defendants

Sussex Insurance Company, Inc.

Bondex Insurance Company

Dale Group, Inc. doing business as Bondex Program Managers

Clarendon National Insurance Company

Companion Property & Casualty Company

Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor in interest to Sussex Ins. Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin P. Gavin

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin P. Gavin

31 Harrington Avenue

Portsmouth, RI 02871

Kevin M. Daley

Attorney at Daley Orton, LLC

1383 Warwick Avenue

Warwick, RI 02888

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Yagoobian

Attorney at Peabody & Arnold LLP

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02110

Scarlett Rajbanshi

Attorney at Peabody & Arnold LLP

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Benjamin I Schimelman

Attorney at Gfeller Laurie LLP

977 Farmington Avenue

West Hartford, CT 06107

Gary A. Strong

Attorney at GFeller Laurie LLP

100 Overlook Ct, Fl 2

Princeton, NJ 08540-7814

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet (with attachment)

1 #3

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Amended Complaint

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sussex Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yagoobian, Christopher) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc.. (Schimelman, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gary A. Strong filed by Benjamin I Schimelman. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/25/2020. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Gary A. Strong to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1542703 ) filed by Bondex Insurance Company. (Schimelman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/21/2020. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Daley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Daley, Kevin) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Scarlett Rajbanshi on behalf of Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. (Rajbanshi, Scarlett) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc..(Schimelman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Gavin on behalf of Hugo Key III (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Yagoobian on behalf of Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. (Yagoobian, Christopher) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0086. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1538435, filed by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet (with attachment))(Schimelman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Gavin on behalf of Hugo Key III (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Yagoobian on behalf of Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. (Yagoobian, Christopher) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0086. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1538435, filed by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet (with attachment))(Schimelman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bondex Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Sussex Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Companion Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARENDON NATIONALINSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant