This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2020 at 08:01:02 (UTC).

Kewazinga Corp. v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 Kewazinga Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01106

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kewazinga Corp.

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian Gregg DiBernardo

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Kenneth Lawrence Stein

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Gregory Springsted

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Saunak Kirti Desai

Attorney at Associate

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Timothy Kelso Gilman

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Esther Weyl

Attorney at Desmarais LLP

230 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10169

Emily Chen

Attorney at Desmarais LLP

101 California St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

John Michael Desmarais

Attorney at Desmarais LLP

230 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

24 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Affidavit

#21

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 6,535226

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 6,522,325

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 9,055,234

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ian G. DiBernardo dated April 6, 2020 re: Kewazinga's Response to Google's Request for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #25 Letter Requesting Leave To File Motion to Dismiss filed by Google LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs shall file a letter response by April 10, 2020. The initial pretrial conference, scheduled for April 9, 2020, is ADJOURNED to April 16, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The Court will call the conference participants once the conference is ready to begin. The participants shall file a joint letter by April 14, 2020, providing the Court with one telephone call-in number for a conference call and, to the extent necessary, a passcode. The participants shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time., ( Initial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/6/20) (yv) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John M. Desmarais dated April 3, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter Requesting Leave To File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Google LLC..(Desmarais, John) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ian G. DiBernardo dated April 2, 2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference Joint Letter. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(DiBernardo, Ian) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The parties shall serve initial disclosures by April 16, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/1/20) (yv) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to serve Initial Disclosures addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elizabeth Weyl dated April 1, 2020. Document filed by Google LLC..(Weyl, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Emily Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19227450. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Emily Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19227450. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Chen, Emily) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Esther Weyl on behalf of Google LLC..(Weyl, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by April 6, 2020. Google LLC answer due 4/6/2020 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/27/2020) (cf) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 18-cv-4500. (jgo) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-04500 (GHW). Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(DiBernardo, Ian) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Google LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18733820)Document filed by Kewazinga Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 9,055,234, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 6,522,325, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 6,535226).(DiBernardo, Ian) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Weyl

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Desmarais