This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:16:41 (UTC).

Kettler v. MSC CRUISES S.A. CO. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Kettler filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against MSC CRUISES S A CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23425

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cori Kettler

Defendants

MSC Cruises (USA) Inc.

MSC CRUISES S.A. CO.

MSC Cruises S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas D Graham

Attorney at Leesfield Scolaro, P.A.

2350 S. Dixie Highway

Miami, FL 33133

Jonathan Edward Freidin

Attorney at Freidin Brown, P.A.

One Biscayne Tower, 2 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice ONLY as to Defendants MSC Cruises (USA), Inc. and MSC Cruises S.A. Co. by Cori Kettler (Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Drop Party Defendants by Cori Kettler (Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MSC Cruises S.A., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc., MSC CRUISES S.A. CO.. MSC Cruises S.A. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; MSC CRUISES S.A. CO. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Holman, Steve) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cori Kettler. MSC Cruises (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against MSC CRUISES S.A. CO., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc., MSC Cruises S.A., filed by Cori Kettler.(Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (yha) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MSC CRUISES S.A. CO., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13368285, filed by Cori Kettler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice ONLY as to Defendants MSC Cruises (USA), Inc. and MSC Cruises S.A. Co. by Cori Kettler (Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Drop Party Defendants by Cori Kettler (Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MSC Cruises S.A., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc., MSC CRUISES S.A. CO.. MSC Cruises S.A. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; MSC CRUISES S.A. CO. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Holman, Steve) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cori Kettler. MSC Cruises (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against MSC CRUISES S.A. CO., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc., MSC Cruises S.A., filed by Cori Kettler.(Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) ENDORSED ORDER Regarding Phone Calls to Chambers. The following rules apply in this and all other civil matters pending before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: 1. Do not call Chambers to ask about the status of pending motions, including motions for extension of time. The Court is aware of all pending motions and will address each of them in due course. 2. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek, or seek to provide, can be conveyed through a filing on the docket. 3. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek is available from other sources, including Court Orders and the Local Rules. 4. If you call Chambers for a permissible purpose, counsel for all affected parties must be on the line. Calls from non-attorneys and ex parte calls will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. (kou) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (yha) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yha) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MSC CRUISES S.A. CO., MSC Cruises (USA) Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13368285, filed by Cori Kettler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Freidin, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less