This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:06:13 (UTC).

K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc. v. D.F. Pray, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 K E S Construction Co , Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against D F Pray, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06809

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.

Defendants

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Zurich American Insurance Company

D.F. Pray, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manny A Frade

Attorney at Meltzer, Lippe, Goldstein & Breitstone, LLP

190 Willis Avenue

Mineola, NY 11501

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. Instructions and Arbitration Procedure sent to Counsel and/or Pro se Litigants. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs. Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) (3). After an Answer is filed, an Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled. The hearing will be scheduled to occur approximately 120 days after filing of the Answer. Counsel have 120 days to complete discovery unless the magistrate judge orders a shorter or longer period for discovery. (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. D.F. Pray, Inc. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against D.F. Pray, Inc., Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12123527 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. Instructions and Arbitration Procedure sent to Counsel and/or Pro se Litigants. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs. Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) (3). After an Answer is filed, an Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled. The hearing will be scheduled to occur approximately 120 days after filing of the Answer. Counsel have 120 days to complete discovery unless the magistrate judge orders a shorter or longer period for discovery. (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. D.F. Pray, Inc. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against D.F. Pray, Inc., Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12123527 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by K.E.S. Construction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Frade, Manny) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.