This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:27 (UTC).

KERSEY v. LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 KERSEY filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LVNV FUNDING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor and James R. Sweeney II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04826

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA KERSEY

Defendant

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Thomas Steinkamp

Attorney at JOHN STEINKAMP & ASSOCIATES

5214 S. East Street, Suite D-1

Indianapolis, IN 46227

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff JESSICA KERSEY. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Affidavit

1 #5

Exhibit A - The November 27, 2019, dunning letters sent directly to Plaintiff

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by JESSICA KERSEY. LVNV FUNDING, LLC served on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - The April 10, 2018, letters sent by Plaintiff's counsel

#8

(#8) CLOSED DISMISSED. ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Pursuant to Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by the Plaintiff in this cause, this cause is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and each party shall bear its own respective costs and expenses, including but not limited to attorneys fees, incurred in connection with this cause. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/15/2020. (JDC) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/8/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #7

Proposed Summons

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice, filed by Plaintiff JESSICA KERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLOSED DISMISSED. ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Pursuant to Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by the Plaintiff in this cause, this cause is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and each party shall bear its own respective costs and expenses, including but not limited to attorneys fees, incurred in connection with this cause. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/15/2020. (JDC) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice, filed by Plaintiff JESSICA KERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/8/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by JESSICA KERSEY. LVNV FUNDING, LLC served on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff JESSICA KERSEY. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against LVNV FUNDING, LLC, filed by JESSICA KERSEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756353) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The April 10, 2018, letters sent by Plaintiff's counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - The dunning letters sent to Plaintiff's counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #5 Exhibit A - The November 27, 2019, dunning letters sent directly to Plaintiff, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less