This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 11:11:57 (UTC).

Kerr v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Kerr filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Lisette M. Reid. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23441

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kwesi O. Kerr

Miami, FL 33194

Respondents

WILLIAM BARR

Chad Wolf

Liana J. Castano

Michael W. Meade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

James Alan Weinkle

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

99 N.E. 4Th Street, Suite 300

Miami, FL 33132

Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE by WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf re #20 Order Dismissing Case, of Service of Order on Petitioner at Glades County Detention Center (Weinkle, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER that the Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and mark this case as CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

19 #2

Exhibit "2" - FTC Letter

19 #1

Exhibit "1" - EARM Report

#19

(#19) STATUS REPORT In Compliance with Second Paperless Order Requiring Status Report (ECF No. 14) by WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - EARM Report, #2 Exhibit "2" - FTC Letter)(Weinkle, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Alan Weinkle on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf. Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party WILLIAM BARR(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Liana J. Castano(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Michael W. Meade(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res). (Weinkle, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#25) SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #17 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant, 16 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. US Mail returned for: Kwesi O. Kerr. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 23 Order Withdrawing Reference/Case No Longer Referred, 14 Order,, #20 Order Dismissing Case,. US Mail returned for: Kwesi O. Kerr. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#23) PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/2/2020. (br) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 2:20-cv-00674, filed 08/31/2020. (jua) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE by WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf re #20 Order Dismissing Case, of Service of Order on Petitioner at Glades County Detention Center (Weinkle, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:20-cv-23441 electronically transferred out to Florida Middle. (wc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER that the Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and mark this case as CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATUS REPORT In Compliance with Second Paperless Order Requiring Status Report (ECF No. 14) by WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - EARM Report, #2 Exhibit "2" - FTC Letter)(Weinkle, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Alan Weinkle on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, Liana J. Castano, Michael W. Meade, Chad Wolf. Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party WILLIAM BARR(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Liana J. Castano(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Michael W. Meade(pty:res), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res). (Weinkle, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#17) INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (daa) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION To File emergency Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 9/4/2020), and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Anonymously and Under Seal by Kwesi O. Kerr. (dj) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons by Kwesi O. Kerr (dj) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kwesi O. Kerr. (dj) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to File Habeas Corpus Under Seal and Anonymously by Kwesi O. Kerr. (dj) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#6) Emergency Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kwesi O. Kerr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(dj) Modified on 8/24/2020 (dj). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis 28 USC 1915 by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner. (nc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner (nc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to File Habeas Corpus Under Seal and Anonymously by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner. (nc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (nc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#1) EMERGENCY PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Kwesi O. Kerr, Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(nc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less